EP3951909 - POWER SUPPLY DEVICE, ELECTRIC VEHICLE AND POWER STORAGE DEVICE INCLUDING POWER SUPPLY DEVICE, FASTENING MEMBER FOR POWER SUPPLY DEVICE, METHOD OF MANUFACTURING FASTENING MEMBER FOR POWER SUPPLY DEVICE, AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING POWER SUPPLY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.01.2022 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SANYO Electric Co., Ltd. 1-1, Sanyo-cho Daito-shi Osaka 574-8534 / JP | [2022/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMASHIRO, Go c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 02 /
FUJINAGA, Koji c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 03 /
KOGAMI, Nao c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2022/06] | 01 /
YAMASHIRO, Go Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | ||
02 /
FUJINAGA, Koji Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | |||
03 /
KOGAMI, Nao Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | Representative(s) | Vigand, Philippe, et al Novagraaf International SA Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex - Genève / CH | [2022/06] | Application number, filing date | 19923079.8 | 26.12.2019 | [2022/06] | WO2019JP51119 | Priority number, date | JP20190066831 | 29.03.2019 Original published format: JP 2019066831 | [2022/06] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020202681 | Date: | 08.10.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3951909 | Date: | 09.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 08.10.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.04.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H01M50/209, H01M50/249, H01M50/264, B23K20/12, H01M50/242 | [2022/21] | CPC: |
H01M50/209 (EP,US);
H01M50/264 (EP,US);
B60K1/04 (US);
H01M50/242 (EP);
H01M50/249 (EP);
H01M50/262 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2022/06] | H01M2/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/06] | Title | German: | STROMVERSORGUNGSVORRICHTUNG, ELEKTRISCHES FAHRZEUG UND ENERGIESPEICHERVORRICHTUNG MIT EINER STROMVERSORGUNGSVORRICHTUNG, BEFESTIGUNGSGLIED FÜR EINE STROMVERSORGUNGSVORRICHTUNG, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES BEFESTIGUNGSGLIEDES FÜR EINE STROMVERSORGUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER STROMVERSORGUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2022/06] | English: | POWER SUPPLY DEVICE, ELECTRIC VEHICLE AND POWER STORAGE DEVICE INCLUDING POWER SUPPLY DEVICE, FASTENING MEMBER FOR POWER SUPPLY DEVICE, METHOD OF MANUFACTURING FASTENING MEMBER FOR POWER SUPPLY DEVICE, AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING POWER SUPPLY DEVICE | [2022/06] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ALIMENTATION ÉLECTRIQUE, VÉHICULE ÉLECTRIQUE ET DISPOSITIF DE STOCKAGE D'ÉNERGIE COMPRENANT UN DISPOSITIF D'ALIMENTATION ÉLECTRIQUE, ÉLÉMENT DE FIXATION POUR DISPOSITIF D'ALIMENTATION ÉLECTRIQUE, PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'ÉLÉMENT DE FIXATION POUR DISPOSITIF D'ALIMENTATION ÉLECTRIQUE, ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE DISPOSITIF D'ALIMENTATION ÉLECTRIQUE | [2022/06] | Entry into regional phase | 05.10.2021 | Translation filed | 05.10.2021 | National basic fee paid | 05.10.2021 | Search fee paid | 05.10.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.10.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/06] | 19.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1745882 (BOEING CO [US]) [A] 1-17* figures 1-3; claims 1-25 *; | [E]EP3734689 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO [JP], et al) [E] 1,3-6,8-15 * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0049]; figures 1-14; claims 1-9 * | International search | [A]JP2011129509 (SB LIMOTIVE CO LTD) [A] 1-17; | [A]JP2016115545 (YAZAKI CORP) [A] 1-17; | [A]WO2018235556 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO [JP]) [A] 1-17; | [PA]WO2019130937 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO [JP], et al)[PA] 1-17 | by applicant | JP2015220117 |