EP3955664 - DATA TRANSMISSION MODE CONFIGURATION METHOD AND APPARATUS, AND DATA TRANSMISSION METHOD AND APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.04.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.01.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Beijing Xiaomi Mobile Software Co., Ltd. No. 018, Floor 8, Building 6, Yard 33 Middle Xierqi Road Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | [2022/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YANG, Xing No.018, Floor 8, Building 6, Yard 33, Middle Xierqi Road, Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | [2022/07] | Representative(s) | Dehns Germany Partnerschaft mbB Theresienstraße 6-8 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/07] | Hughes, Andrea Michelle Dehns Germany Theresienstraße 6-8 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19923955.9 | 08.04.2019 | [2022/07] | WO2019CN81779 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020206595 | Date: | 15.10.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3955664 | Date: | 16.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 15.10.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/02, H04W72/12, H04W76/14 | [2022/17] | CPC: |
H04W76/14 (EP);
H04W72/21 (CN);
H04W72/23 (EP,CN,US);
H04W72/02 (EP);
H04W72/12 (EP,US);
H04W28/0278 (US)
|
Former IPC [2022/07] | H04W72/02, H04W72/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/07] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR KONFIGURATION EINES DATENÜBERTRAGUNGSMODUS SOWIE DATENÜBERTRAGUNGSVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG | [2022/07] | English: | DATA TRANSMISSION MODE CONFIGURATION METHOD AND APPARATUS, AND DATA TRANSMISSION METHOD AND APPARATUS | [2022/07] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE CONFIGURATION DE MODE DE TRANSMISSION DE DONNÉES, ET PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE TRANSMISSION DE DONNÉES | [2022/07] | Entry into regional phase | 02.11.2021 | Translation filed | 02.11.2021 | National basic fee paid | 02.11.2021 | Search fee paid | 02.11.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.11.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.11.2021 | Examination requested [2022/07] | 28.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.04.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.07.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2017201904 (LEE SUNYOUNG [KR], et al) [A] 1-15* paragraph [0016] *; | [A]EP3301986 (PANASONIC IP CORP AMERICA [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0001] - [0003] *; | [IA] - VIVO, "Discussion on support of simultaneous mode 1 and mode 2", vol. RAN WG2, no. Athens, Greece; 20190225 - 20190301, (20190215), 3GPP DRAFT; R2-1901118_DISCUSSION ON SUPPORT OF SIMULTANEOUS MODE 1 AND MODE 2, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg%5Fran/WG2%5FRL2/TSGR2%5F105/Docs/R2%2D1901118%2Ezip, (20190215), XP051602480 [I] 1-6,11-15 * paragraphs [0001] - [0003] * [A] 7-10 | International search | [A]CN104954976 (YULONG COMPUTER TELECOMM TECH) [A] 1-26* entire document *; | [A]US2017201904 (LEE SUNYOUNG [KR], et al) [A] 1-26 * entire document *; | [A]CN108401302 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-26 * entire document *; | [X]CN109565494 (PANASONIC IP CORP AMERICA) [X] 1, 2, 6, 11, 17, 22-26 * description, paragraphs [0241]-[0341] * |