EP3954392 - COMPOSITION FOR ORAL ADMINISTRATION WITH CONTROLLED RELEASE PROPERTIES COMPRISING COMPLEX OF CLAY MINERALS, METHOD FOR PREPARING SAME, AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING RELEASE PROPERTIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.05.2024 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.03.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.01.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KOREA INSTITUTE OF GEOSCIENCE AND MINERAL RESOURCES 124, Gwahak-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34132 / KR | For all designated states Biophammer Corp. 5-409, 394 Jigok-ro, Nam-gu Pohang-si, Gyeongsangbuk-do, 37668 / KR | [2022/10] |
Former [2022/07] | For all designated states KOREA INSTITUTE OF GEOSCIENCE AND MINERAL RESOURCES 124, Gwahak-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34132 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KANG, Il-Mo 104-503, 55, Yangcheon-ro 55-gil Gangseo-gu Seoul 07528 / KR | 02 /
LEE, Jangik lke 122E-304, 1, Gwanak-ro Gwanak-gu Seoul 08826 / KR | 03 /
KIM, Dae-Duk 501-1610, 30, Seocho-daero 74-gil Seocho-gu Seoul 06622 / KR | 04 /
KIM, Jae Hwan 410-2001, 99, Jangnyangjungang-ro Buk-gu Pohang-si, Gyeongsangbuk-do 37571 / KR | 05 /
ROH, Ki-Min 203-1003, 20, Songnim-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34061 / KR | 06 /
SEO, Sung Man 108, 16, Jeongmongju-ro 646beon-gil, Ocheon-eup Nam-gu Pohang-si, Gyeongsangbuk-do 37905 / KR | 07 /
JUNG, Su Young 212-403, 24, Jungdae-ro Songpa-gu Seoul 05834 / KR | 08 /
PARK, Ju-Hwan 102-802, 84, Nangye-ro Seongdong-gu Seoul 04712 / KR | 09 /
BAEK, Min-Jun 206, 42-5, Daehak 7-gil Gwanak-gu Seoul 08817 / KR | 10 /
KIM, Gyu-Ho 905-417, 1, Gwanak-ro Gwanak-gu Seoul 08826 / KR | [2024/11] |
Former [2022/07] | 01 /
KANG, Il-Mo 104-503, 55, Yangcheon-ro 55-gil Gangseo-gu Seoul 07528 / KR | ||
02 /
LEE, Jangik lke 122E-304, 1, Gwanak-ro Gwanak-gu Seoul 08826 / KR | |||
03 /
KIM, Dae-Duk 501-1610, 30, Seocho-daero 74-gil Seocho-gu Seoul 06622 / KR | |||
04 /
KIM, Jae Hwan 410-2001, 99, Jangnyangjungang-ro Buk-gu Pohang-si Gyeongsangbuk-do 37571 / KR | |||
05 /
ROH, Ki-Min 203-1003, 20, Songnim-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34061 / KR | |||
06 /
SEO, Sung Man 108, 16, Jeongmongju-ro 646beon-gil, Ocheon-eup Nam-gu Pohang-si Gyeongsangbuk-do 37905 / KR | |||
07 /
JUNG, Su Young 212-403, 24, Jungdae-ro Songpa-gu Seoul 05834 / KR | |||
08 /
PARK, Ju-Hwan 102-802, 84, Nangye-ro Seongdong-gu Seoul 04712 / KR | |||
09 /
BAEK, Min-Jun 206, 42-5, Daehak 7-gil Gwanak-gu Seoul 08817 / KR | |||
10 /
KIM, Gyu-Ho 905-417, 1, Gwanak-ro Gwanak-gu Seoul 08826 / KR | Representative(s) | Gulde & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Wallstraße 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | [2022/07] | Application number, filing date | 19924243.9 | 17.12.2019 | [2022/07] | WO2019KR17924 | Priority number, date | KR20190043173 | 12.04.2019 Original published format: KR 20190043173 | [2022/07] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020209475 | Date: | 15.10.2020 | Language: | KO | [2020/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3954392 | Date: | 16.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3954392 | Date: | 05.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 15.10.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61K47/52, A61K31/444, A61K9/00, C07D401/14 | [2022/25] | CPC: |
A61K9/0053 (EP,KR,US);
A61K47/52 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/4353 (US);
A23L33/10 (EP,KR);
A23L33/165 (KR);
A61K31/444 (EP,KR,US);
A61K33/06 (EP,US);
A61K9/08 (US);
A61K9/141 (EP);
A61K9/143 (EP);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P1/04 (EP,KR,US);
A61P1/12 (US);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P37/06 (US);
C07K5/06026 (EP);
C07K5/06034 (EP);
C07K5/06078 (EP);
A23V2002/00 (KR);
A23V2200/32 (KR);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/444, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K33/06, A61K2300/00 (EP) |
Former IPC [2022/07] | A61K47/52, A61K31/444, A61K9/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/07] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR ORALEN VERABREICHUNG MIT KONTROLLIERTEN FREISETZUNGSEIGENSCHAFTEN MIT EINEM KOMPLEX AUS TONMINERALIEN, VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG DER FREISETZUNGSEIGENSCHAFTEN | [2022/07] | English: | COMPOSITION FOR ORAL ADMINISTRATION WITH CONTROLLED RELEASE PROPERTIES COMPRISING COMPLEX OF CLAY MINERALS, METHOD FOR PREPARING SAME, AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING RELEASE PROPERTIES | [2022/07] | French: | COMPOSITION POUR ADMINISTRATION PAR VOIE ORALE PRÉSENTANT DES PROPRIÉTÉS DE LIBÉRATION CONTRÔLÉE, COMPRENANT UN COMPLEXE DE MINÉRAUX ARGILEUX, PROCÉDÉ POUR SA PRÉPARATION ET PROCÉDÉ DE RÉGULATION DES PROPRIÉTÉS DE LIBÉRATION | [2022/07] | Entry into regional phase | 12.11.2021 | Translation filed | 12.11.2021 | National basic fee paid | 12.11.2021 | Search fee paid | 12.11.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.11.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.11.2021 | Examination requested [2022/07] | 14.11.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.04.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 29.04.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.04.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]WO2016163754 (MEDPACTO INC [KR]); | [Y]US2017246174 (AMATANGELO MICHAEL [US], et al) | International search | [A]KR20180013568 (KOREA FOOD RES INST [KR], et al); | [Y]KR101922369B (KOREA INST GEOSCIENCE & MINERAL RESOURCES KIGAM [KR]); | [PX]KR102035479B (KOREA INST GEOSCIENCE & MINERAL RESOURCES KIGAM [KR]); | by applicant | KR20130028749 | KR101500665B |