EP3953984 - BATTERY PASTE MIXER AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.09.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.07.2024 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.04.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.01.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.09.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wirtz Manufacturing Co., Inc. 1105 24th Street P. O. Box 5006 Port Huron, MI 48061-5006 / US | [2022/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BARANYAI, Stephen, G. 3716 Eaton Gate Lane Auburn Hills, MI 48326-3894 / US | 02 /
WIRTZ, Robert, N. 902 Fernwood Road Royal Oak, MI 48067 / US | [2022/07] | Representative(s) | HWP Intellectual Property Ridlerstraße 35 80339 München / DE | [2022/07] | Application number, filing date | 19924494.8 | 06.06.2019 | [2022/07] | WO2019US35806 | Priority number, date | WO2019US26774 | 10.04.2019 Original published format: PCT/US2019/026774 | [2022/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020209881 | Date: | 15.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3953984 | Date: | 16.02.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.10.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 15.10.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.04.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H01M4/20, B05C11/11, H01M4/04, H01M4/16, H01M4/62, H01M4/73, H01M10/12 | [2022/07] | CPC: |
H01M4/20 (EP,KR,US);
B01F35/00 (KR);
B01F35/92 (EP,US);
B01D5/0057 (KR);
B01D5/006 (KR);
B01D5/009 (KR);
B01D53/002 (KR);
B01F23/511 (US);
B01F23/53 (US);
B01F23/54 (US);
B01F25/50 (US);
B01F27/82 (EP,US);
B01F35/71731 (EP,US);
B01F35/71805 (KR);
B01F35/90 (US);
F28D1/06 (EP);
H01M4/21 (EP,KR,US);
H01M4/56 (US);
B01F2035/98 (EP,US);
B01F2101/59 (KR);
F28F2009/222 (EP);
F28F2009/226 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/07] | Title | German: | BATTERIEPASTENMISCHER UND VERFAHREN | [2022/07] | English: | BATTERY PASTE MIXER AND METHOD | [2022/07] | French: | MÉLANGEUR DE PÂTE DE BATTERIE ET PROCÉDÉ | [2022/07] | Entry into regional phase | 08.11.2021 | National basic fee paid | 08.11.2021 | Search fee paid | 08.11.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.11.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.11.2021 | Examination requested [2022/07] | 13.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.04.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.07.2024 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 13.09.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB522912 (BRUCE LISTON SIMPSON); | [A]GB1232336 ; | [A]GB1572647 (NAT ENG CO); | [A]WO9014693 (GLOBE UNION INC [US]); | [A]WO0126170 (KVG TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al); | [A]WO2013101254 (GREEN OILFIELD ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICES INC [US]); | International search | [Y]US4074969 (LAWRENCE JACKSON); | [A]US6531248 (ZGURIS GEORGE C [US], et al); | [A]CN203944334U (CHAOWEI POWER CO LTD); | [A]US2016288154 (MENDOZA ROEL [US], et al); | [Y]CN106099031 (TIANNENG BATTERY WUHU CO LTD ) | by applicant | WO9014693 |