EP3958421 - POWER CONVERSION CIRCUIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.01.2022 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HITACHI INDUSTRIAL EQUIPMENT SYSTEMS CO., LTD. 3, Kanda Neribei-cho, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-0022 / JP | [2022/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SATO, Fumihiro c/o Hitachi Industrial Equipment Systems Co., Ltd. 3, Kanda Neribei-cho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-0022 / JP | 02 /
HIRAGA, Masahiro c/o Hitachi Industrial Equipment Systems Co., Ltd. 3, Kanda Neribei-cho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-0022 / JP | 03 /
TANAKA, Makoto c/o Hitachi Industrial Equipment Systems Co., Ltd. 3, Kanda Neribei-cho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-0022 / JP | 04 /
TANABE, Keisuke c/o Hitachi Industrial Equipment Systems Co., Ltd. 3, Kanda Neribei-cho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-0022 / JP | [2022/08] | Representative(s) | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | [2022/08] | Application number, filing date | 19924716.4 | 18.04.2019 | [2022/08] | WO2019JP16577 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020213113 | Date: | 22.10.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3958421 | Date: | 23.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 22.10.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H02J1/00, H02M3/00 | [2022/08] | CPC: |
H02M1/008 (EP,US);
H02J1/082 (EP);
H02M1/32 (EP);
H02M1/36 (EP);
H02M3/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/08] | Title | German: | STROMWANDLUNGSSCHALTUNG | [2022/08] | English: | POWER CONVERSION CIRCUIT | [2022/08] | French: | CIRCUIT DE CONVERSION D'ÉNERGIE | [2022/08] | Entry into regional phase | 18.10.2021 | Translation filed | 18.11.2021 | National basic fee paid | 18.11.2021 | Search fee paid | 18.11.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.11.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.11.2021 | Examination requested [2022/08] | 01.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2010201200 (HORI YUJI [JP]) [X] 1,3-6 * paragraphs [0005] - [0015] - [0029] - [0044] - [0066]; figures 1,3,5,8 * [I] 2,7-17; | [I]US2010211811 (ZHOU HAI-QING [CN], et al) [I] 1 * abstract *; | [A]EP2369727 (BEL FUSE MACAO COMMERCIAL OFFSHORE LTD [CN]) [A] 1-17* paragraphs [0042] - [0044]; figures 1-5 * | International search | [Y]JPS51121727 (NIPPON DENSO CO) [Y] 12, 14-17 * , *; | [Y]JPS56168816U [Y] 1-17; | [Y]JPH09265327 (KYOCERA CORP, et al) [Y] 1-17 * , *; | [Y]JP2007223798 (TOSHIBA ELEVATOR CO LTD) [Y] 17* , *; | [Y]JP2010110037 (FUJI ELECTRIC SYSTEMS CO LTD) [Y] 11, 12, 14-17 * , *; | [Y]JP2012050216 (MITSUMI ELECTRIC CO LTD ) [Y] 1-17 * , *; | [Y]JP2013229951 (FUJITSU SEMICONDUCTOR LTD) [Y] 11, 12, 14-17 * , *; | [Y]JP2017046402 (TOSHIBA MITSUBISHI-ELECTRIC IND SYSTEM CORP) [Y] 17 * , * | by applicant | JP2015141585 |