EP3958453 - MULTI-PHASE SIGNAL CONTROL CIRCUIT AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.05.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.01.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2022/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEN, Yue Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
WANG, Jiake Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
CHEN, Liang Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2022/08] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2022/08] | Application number, filing date | 19924931.9 | 18.04.2019 | [2022/08] | WO2019CN83307 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020211059 | Date: | 22.10.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3958453 | Date: | 23.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 22.10.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H02M1/08, H02M1/14, H02M3/07, // H02M1/084 | [2022/14] | CPC: |
H02M1/08 (EP);
H03K5/00006 (US);
H02M1/14 (EP);
H02M3/07 (EP);
H03K19/20 (US);
H03K3/0315 (US);
H03K3/037 (US);
H03K5/1515 (EP);
H02M1/084 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2022/08] | H02M3/158 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/08] | Title | German: | STEUERUNGSSCHALTUNG UND -VERFAHREN FÜR MEHRPHASIGES SIGNAL | [2022/08] | English: | MULTI-PHASE SIGNAL CONTROL CIRCUIT AND METHOD | [2022/08] | French: | CIRCUIT ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DE SIGNAL POLYPHASÉ | [2022/08] | Entry into regional phase | 21.10.2021 | Translation filed | 21.10.2021 | National basic fee paid | 21.10.2021 | Search fee paid | 21.10.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.10.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/08] | 12.08.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.05.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.08.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.08.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2009121781 (OYAMA MANABU [JP], et al); | [A]US2012105038 (CHEN SICHENG [US], et al); | [A]US2012274394 (CHAN CHENG-PANG [TW]) | International search | [YA]CN201118434Y (UNIV NORTH CHINA ELEC POWER [CN]) [Y] 1-2, 13-14, 24-25 [A] [] ; | [A]US2008246523 (MURAKAMI SHINTAROH [JP], et al)[A] 1-25; | [A]CN101488712 (EUREKA MICROELECTRONICS INC [CN]) [A] 1-25; | [A]CN104617931 (CHONGQING XND COMM CO LTD) [A] 1-25; | [YA]CN105048808 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) [Y] 1-2, 13-14, 24-25 [A] [] |