EP3934051 - POWER CONVERSION CIRCUIT, INVERTER, AND CONTROL METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.03.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.12.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.05.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.12.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 24.04.2024 [2024/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Digital Power Technologies Co., Ltd. Office 01, 39th Floor, Block A Antuoshan Headquarters Towers 33 Antuoshan 6th Road Futian District Shenzhen, 518043 / CN | [2022/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Zhaohui Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
SHI, Lei Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
CHEN, Dong Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2024/17] |
Former [2022/01] | 01 /
WANG, Zhaohui Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | ||
02 /
SHI, Lei Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | |||
03 /
CHEN, Dong Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2022/01] | Application number, filing date | 19925326.1 | 20.12.2019 | [2022/01] | WO2019CN126910 | Priority number, date | CN201910310890 | 17.04.2019 Original published format: CN201910310890 | [2022/01] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020211424 | Date: | 22.10.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3934051 | Date: | 05.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3934051 | Date: | 24.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 22.10.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H02J3/38, H02M7/5387, H02M1/12, H02M1/14, H02M1/00 | [2022/22] | CPC: |
H02M1/123 (EP,US);
H02J3/383 (CN);
H02M7/53871 (EP,CN,US);
H02J3/381 (EP,US);
H02M1/0048 (EP);
H02M1/14 (CN,US);
|
Former IPC [2022/01] | H02J3/38, H02M7/5387, H02M1/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LEISTUNGSWANDLERSCHALTUNG, WECHSELRICHTER UND STEUERUNGSVERFAHREN | [2022/01] | English: | POWER CONVERSION CIRCUIT, INVERTER, AND CONTROL METHOD | [2022/01] | French: | CIRCUIT DE CONVERSION DE COURANT, ONDULEUR, ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE | [2022/01] | Entry into regional phase | 28.09.2021 | Translation filed | 28.09.2021 | National basic fee paid | 28.09.2021 | Search fee paid | 28.09.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.09.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.09.2021 | Examination requested [2022/01] | 24.11.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.05.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.09.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.12.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 13.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]EP3171499 (CONSTRUCTIONS ELECTRONIQUES + TELECOMMUNICATIONS [BE]) [X] 1-6,8,11,14,15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] , [0004] , [0006] , [0010] , [0018] - [0022] - [0046]; figures 1,2; claim 1 * [A] 7 [Y] 9,10,12,13; | [Y]CN107294464 (UNIV HUAZHONG SCIENCE TECH) [Y] 9,10,12,13 * abstract ** paragraphs [0037] - [0060]; figures 1-6 *; | [XA] - RICARDO SOUZA FIGUEREDO ET AL, 2013 BRAZILIAN POWER ELECTRONICS CONFERENCE, (20131001), doi:10.1109/COBEP.2013.6785164, ISBN 978-1-47-990272-9, pages 517 - 524, XP055118163 [X] 1-6,8,11,14,15 * abstract * * page 520; figures 7,9 * [A] 7,9,10,12,13 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/COBEP.2013.6785164 | Examination | - Gubia Eugenio ET AL, "EMI filter inductor size for transformerless PV systems based on the full bridge structure", Power Electronics and Motion Control Conference (EPE/PEMC), 2010 14th International, Piscataway, NJ, USA, doi:10.1109/EPEPEMC.2010.5606553, ISBN 978-1-4244-7856-9, (20100901), pages 1 - 5, URL: https://ieeexplore.ieee.org/stampPDF/getPDF.jsp?tp=&arnumber=5606553&ref=aHR0cHM6Ly9pZWVleHBsb3JlLmllZWUub3JnL2RvY3VtZW50LzU2MDY1NTM=, XP093036235 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/EPEPEMC.2010.5606553 |