EP3957591 - ELEVATOR PASSENGER CAR AND ELEVATOR HAVING SAME CAR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.07.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.01.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.07.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | [2022/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KARIYA Tomoki c/o HITACHI, LTD., 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | 02 /
SHIMADA Katsuhiro c/o HITACHI, LTD., 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | 03 /
KAWAKAMI Hiroshi c/o HITACHI, LTD., 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | 04 /
TOMURA Yoshiki c/o HITACHI, LTD., 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | 05 /
OSUGA Mari c/o HITACHI, LTD., 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | [2022/08] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [2022/08] | Application number, filing date | 19925437.6 | 19.04.2019 | [2022/08] | WO2019JP16736 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020213147 | Date: | 22.10.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3957591 | Date: | 23.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 22.10.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B66B11/02 | [2022/08] | CPC: |
B66B11/0206 (EP,US);
B66B11/0273 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/08] | Title | German: | AUFZUGSKABINE UND AUFZUG MIT DIESER KABINE | [2022/08] | English: | ELEVATOR PASSENGER CAR AND ELEVATOR HAVING SAME CAR | [2022/08] | French: | CABINE DE PASSAGERS D'ASCENSEUR ET ASCENSEUR COMPRENANT LADITE CABINE | [2022/08] | Entry into regional phase | 18.10.2021 | Translation filed | 18.10.2021 | National basic fee paid | 18.10.2021 | Search fee paid | 18.10.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.10.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/08] | 03.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.07.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPS5617412Y ; | [A]JPS5946970U ; | [A]WO2012028597 (INVENTIO AG [CH], et al); | [XA]WO2015045097 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) | by applicant | JP2012006695 |