EP4024401 - VISION CORRECTION SURGERY RECOMMENDATION METHOD AND APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.06.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.03.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 06.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.09.2024 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Visuworks 4th Floor, 5, Seocho-daero 78-gil Seocho-gu Seoul 06620 / KR | [2022/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Jin Kuk 1312, 138, Bongeunsa-ro Gangnam-gu Seoul 06124 / KR | 02 /
RYU, Ik Hee 101dong 1505ho, 13-10, Seocho-daero 65-gil Seocho-gu Seoul 06602 / KR | [2022/27] | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstraße 31 80801 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/27] | Dantz, Jan Henning, et al Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Zwinger 2 33602 Bielefeld / DE | Application number, filing date | 19926732.9 | 27.08.2019 | [2022/27] | WO2019KR10959 | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021040077 | Date: | 04.03.2021 | Language: | KO | [2021/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4024401 | Date: | 06.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 04.03.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.04.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G16H20/40, A61B3/00, G16H50/30, A61F9/008, G06N20/00 | [2023/19] | CPC: |
G16H20/40 (EP,US);
A61B3/107 (US);
A61B3/0025 (EP);
A61B5/7275 (US);
A61F9/008 (US);
A61F9/00804 (EP);
A61F9/00806 (EP);
A61F9/00827 (EP);
A61F9/00829 (EP);
G06N20/00 (EP,US);
G16H50/30 (EP,US);
A61F2009/00872 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2022/27] | G16H20/40, A61F9/008 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/27] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR EMPFEHLUNG EINER SEHKORREKTUROPERATION | [2022/27] | English: | VISION CORRECTION SURGERY RECOMMENDATION METHOD AND APPARATUS | [2022/27] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE RECOMMANDATION DE CHIRURGIE DE CORRECTION DE LA VISION | [2022/27] | Entry into regional phase | 05.11.2020 | Translation filed | 05.11.2020 | National basic fee paid | 05.11.2020 | Search fee paid | 05.11.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.11.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.11.2020 | Examination requested [2022/27] | 23.10.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.10.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2007161972 (FELBERG CRAIG L [US], et al); | International search | [A]JP2005521473 ; | [Y]KR20120110176 (TECHNOLAS GMBH [DE]); | [A]US2014081395 (WEEBER HENDRIK A [NL]); | [A]KR20160030389 (KIM SUNG IL [KR]); | [XY]US2018161098 (GUPTA MANISH [IN], et al) |