EP3800725 - THERMAL RUNAWAY DETECTION METHOD, DEVICE AND SYSTEM FOR BATTERIES, AND BATTERY MANAGEMENT UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.08.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.09.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 31.07.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.02.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.03.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 17.04.2024 [2024/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Contemporary Amperex Technology Co., Limited 2 Xingang Road, Zhangwan Town Jiaocheng District Ningde, Fujian 352100 / CN | [2021/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Xiao No. 2, Xingang Road, Zhangwan Town Jiaocheng District Ningde, Fujian 352100 / CN | 02 /
ZENG, Chao No. 2, Xingang Road, Zhangwan Town Jiaocheng District Ningde, Fujian 352100 / CN | 03 /
XU, Jia No. 2, Xingang Road, Zhangwan Town Jiaocheng District Ningde, Fujian 352100 / CN | 04 /
DAN, Zhimin No. 2, Xingang Road, Zhangwan Town Jiaocheng District Ningde, Fujian 352100 / CN | 05 /
HOU, Yizhen No. 2, Xingang Road, Zhangwan Town Jiaocheng District Ningde, Fujian 352100 / CN | 06 /
ZHANG, Wei No. 2, Xingang Road, Zhangwan Town Jiaocheng District Ningde, Fujian 352100 / CN | 07 /
HU, Guoliang No. 2, Xingang Road, Zhangwan Town Jiaocheng District Ningde, Fujian 352100 / CN | [2021/14] | Representative(s) | Frick, Robert Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstraße 23 80538 München / DE | [2021/14] | Application number, filing date | 19926818.6 | 13.08.2019 | [2021/14] | WO2019CN100445 | Priority number, date | CN201910361841 | 30.04.2019 Original published format: CN201910361841 | [2021/14] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020220512 | Date: | 05.11.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3800725 | Date: | 07.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3800725 | Date: | 19.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 05.11.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.09.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H01M10/48, H01M10/42, B60L58/24, B60L3/00 | [2021/41] | CPC: |
B60L58/24 (EP,US);
H01M10/4207 (EP,CN);
H01M10/486 (EP,CN,US);
B60L3/0046 (EP);
H01M10/425 (EP,CN);
H01M10/4257 (EP,US);
H01M10/4285 (CN);
H01M10/48 (EP);
H01M10/482 (CN);
H01M10/488 (CN);
B60L2240/545 (EP);
B60L2250/10 (EP,US);
H01M2010/4271 (EP,CN,US);
H01M2010/4278 (CN);
H01M2220/20 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2021/14] | H01M10/42 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/14] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR DETEKTION VON THERMISCHEM DURCHGEHEN, VORRICHTUNG UND SYSTEM FÜR BATTERIEN UND BATTERIEVERWALTUNGSEINHEIT | [2021/14] | English: | THERMAL RUNAWAY DETECTION METHOD, DEVICE AND SYSTEM FOR BATTERIES, AND BATTERY MANAGEMENT UNIT | [2021/14] | French: | PROCÉDÉ, DISPOSITIF ET SYSTÈME DE DÉTECTION D'EMBALLEMENT THERMIQUE POUR BATTERIES, ET UNITÉ DE GESTION DE BATTERIE | [2021/14] | Entry into regional phase | 29.12.2020 | Translation filed | 29.12.2020 | National basic fee paid | 29.12.2020 | Search fee paid | 29.12.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.12.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/14] | 09.12.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.02.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.04.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.09.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 13.09.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.09.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 20.07.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 19.10.2022 | AT | 19.10.2022 | CZ | 19.10.2022 | DK | 19.10.2022 | EE | 19.10.2022 | ES | 19.10.2022 | FI | 19.10.2022 | HR | 19.10.2022 | LT | 19.10.2022 | LV | 19.10.2022 | MC | 19.10.2022 | NL | 19.10.2022 | PL | 19.10.2022 | RO | 19.10.2022 | RS | 19.10.2022 | SE | 19.10.2022 | SI | 19.10.2022 | SK | 19.10.2022 | SM | 19.10.2022 | NO | 19.01.2023 | GR | 20.01.2023 | IS | 19.02.2023 | PT | 20.02.2023 | [2024/16] |
Former [2023/51] | AL | 19.10.2022 | |
AT | 19.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2022 | ||
DK | 19.10.2022 | ||
EE | 19.10.2022 | ||
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
HR | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
NL | 19.10.2022 | ||
PL | 19.10.2022 | ||
RO | 19.10.2022 | ||
RS | 19.10.2022 | ||
SE | 19.10.2022 | ||
SI | 19.10.2022 | ||
SK | 19.10.2022 | ||
SM | 19.10.2022 | ||
NO | 19.01.2023 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
IS | 19.02.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 19.10.2022 | |
AT | 19.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2022 | ||
DK | 19.10.2022 | ||
EE | 19.10.2022 | ||
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
HR | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
NL | 19.10.2022 | ||
PL | 19.10.2022 | ||
RO | 19.10.2022 | ||
RS | 19.10.2022 | ||
SE | 19.10.2022 | ||
SK | 19.10.2022 | ||
SM | 19.10.2022 | ||
NO | 19.01.2023 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
IS | 19.02.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 19.10.2022 | |
AT | 19.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2022 | ||
DK | 19.10.2022 | ||
EE | 19.10.2022 | ||
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
HR | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
NL | 19.10.2022 | ||
PL | 19.10.2022 | ||
RO | 19.10.2022 | ||
RS | 19.10.2022 | ||
SE | 19.10.2022 | ||
SM | 19.10.2022 | ||
NO | 19.01.2023 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
IS | 19.02.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 19.10.2022 | |
CZ | 19.10.2022 | ||
DK | 19.10.2022 | ||
EE | 19.10.2022 | ||
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
HR | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
NL | 19.10.2022 | ||
PL | 19.10.2022 | ||
RO | 19.10.2022 | ||
RS | 19.10.2022 | ||
SE | 19.10.2022 | ||
SM | 19.10.2022 | ||
NO | 19.01.2023 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
IS | 19.02.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | AT | 19.10.2022 | |
DK | 19.10.2022 | ||
EE | 19.10.2022 | ||
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
HR | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
NL | 19.10.2022 | ||
PL | 19.10.2022 | ||
RS | 19.10.2022 | ||
SE | 19.10.2022 | ||
SM | 19.10.2022 | ||
NO | 19.01.2023 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
IS | 19.02.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AT | 19.10.2022 | |
DK | 19.10.2022 | ||
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
HR | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
NL | 19.10.2022 | ||
PL | 19.10.2022 | ||
RS | 19.10.2022 | ||
SE | 19.10.2022 | ||
SM | 19.10.2022 | ||
NO | 19.01.2023 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
IS | 19.02.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AT | 19.10.2022 | |
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
HR | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
NL | 19.10.2022 | ||
PL | 19.10.2022 | ||
RS | 19.10.2022 | ||
SE | 19.10.2022 | ||
NO | 19.01.2023 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
IS | 19.02.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 19.10.2022 | |
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
NL | 19.10.2022 | ||
SE | 19.10.2022 | ||
NO | 19.01.2023 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 19.10.2022 | |
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
NL | 19.10.2022 | ||
SE | 19.10.2022 | ||
NO | 19.01.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 19.10.2022 | |
NL | 19.10.2022 | ||
NO | 19.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/17] | NL | 19.10.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]CN206022563U (HENAN LI-POWER SUPPLY CO LTD) |