EP3916813 - DOUBLE-SIDED POWER GENERATION SOLAR CELL AND FABRICATING METHOD THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 24.03.2023 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.08.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.10.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.03.2023 | Withdrawal of application | published on 26.04.2023 [2023/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nantong T-Sun New Energy Co., Ltd. No.28 Jiqing Road Economic and Technological Development Zone Nantong, Jiangsu 226010 / CN | [2021/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHU, Peng No.28 Jiqing Road Economic and Technological Development Zone Nantong, Jiangsu 226000 / CN | 02 /
LIU, Yuan No.28 Jiqing Road Economic and Technological Development Zone Nantong, Jiangsu 226000 / CN | 03 /
WU, Guang No.28 Jiqing Road Economic and Technological Development Zone Nantong, Jiangsu 226000 / CN | 04 /
ZHENG, Jinhua No.28 Jiqing Road Economic and Technological Development Zone Nantong, Jiangsu 226000 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2021/48] | 01 /
ZHU, Peng Nantong, Jiangsu 226000 / CN | ||
02 /
LIU, Yuan Nantong, Jiangsu 226000 / CN | |||
03 /
WU, Guang Nantong, Jiangsu 226000 / CN | |||
04 /
ZHENG, Jinhua Nantong, Jiangsu 226000 / CN | Representative(s) | Sun, Yiming HUASUN Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Friedrichstraße 33 80801 München / DE | [2021/48] | Application number, filing date | 19927345.9 | 13.05.2019 | [2021/48] | WO2019CN86564 | Priority number, date | CN201910353961 | 29.04.2019 Original published format: CN201910353961 | [2021/48] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020220394 | Date: | 05.11.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3916813 | Date: | 01.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 05.11.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H01L31/0216 | [2021/48] | CPC: |
H01L31/068 (EP);
H01L31/02167 (EP);
H01L31/02168 (CN);
H01L31/022425 (EP,CN);
H01L31/0684 (CN);
H01L31/1804 (CN);
Y02E10/547 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/48] | Title | German: | DOPPELSEITIGE STROMERZEUGENDE SOLARZELLE UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2021/48] | English: | DOUBLE-SIDED POWER GENERATION SOLAR CELL AND FABRICATING METHOD THEREFOR | [2021/48] | French: | CELLULE SOLAIRE DE PRODUCTION D'ÉLECTRICITÉ DOUBLE FACE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2021/48] | Entry into regional phase | 27.08.2021 | Translation filed | 27.08.2021 | National basic fee paid | 27.08.2021 | Search fee paid | 27.08.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.08.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.08.2021 | Examination requested [2021/48] | 23.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.08.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.12.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.03.2023 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2023/17] | 05.10.2023 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2008200036 (STOCKUM WERNER [DE], et al) [A] 1,6 * abstract ** paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0044] *; | [A]CN101540350B (UNIV SUN YAT SEN) [A] 1,6 * abstract *; | [XDI]CN103489934 (JA YANGZHOU SOLAR ENERGY TECHNOLOGY CO LTD, et al) [XD] 1-7,9 * abstract * * Embodiment 1 * [I] 8; | [A]CN105742410 (TAIZHOU ZHONGLAI PHOTOELECTRIC TECH CO LTD) [A] 1,6 * abstract * | International search | [Y]CN103489934 (JA YANGZHOU SOLAR ENERGY TECHNOLOGY CO LTD, et al) [Y] 1-9 * description, paragraph [0039], and figures 1, 2 and 5 *; | [A]KR20140038030 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 1-9* entire document *; | [Y]CN105742410 (TAIZHOU ZHONGLAI PHOTOELECTRIC TECH CO LTD) [Y] 1-9 * description, paragraph [0044], and figure 9 * | by applicant | CN103489934 | CN104362189 |