EP3909047 - DOUBLE DATA RATE CIRCUIT AND DATA GENERATION METHOD IMPLEMENTING PRECISE DUTY CYCLE CONTROL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.08.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.09.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.05.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.10.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yangtze Memory Technologies Co., Ltd. No.88 Weilai 3rd Road East Lake High-tech Development Zone Wuhan, Hubei 430074 / CN | [2021/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SONG, Daesik Room 7018, No.18, Huaguang Road, Guandong Science And Technology Industrial Park, East Lake High- Tech Development Zone Wuhan, Hubei 430074 / CN | 02 /
KIM, James Room 7018, No.18, Huaguang Road, Guandong Science And Technology Industrial Park, East Lake High- Tech Development Zone Wuhan, Hubei 430074 / CN | [2023/40] |
Former [2021/46] | 01 /
SONG, Daesik Wuhan, Hubei 430074 / CN | ||
02 /
KIM, James Wuhan, Hubei 430074 / CN | Representative(s) | Gramm, Lins & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Freundallee 13a 30173 Hannover / DE | [2021/46] | Application number, filing date | 19927736.9 | 05.05.2019 | [2021/46] | WO2019CN85451 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020223844 | Date: | 12.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3909047 | Date: | 17.11.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.11.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3909047 | Date: | 04.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 12.11.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G11C7/22, G11C7/10, G06F13/16, H03K5/156, H03K19/20 | [2022/36] | CPC: |
H03K5/1565 (EP,KR,US);
G11C7/222 (EP,CN,KR);
G06F1/06 (US);
G06F1/10 (US);
G11C7/1066 (EP,KR);
G11C7/1093 (EP,KR);
|
Former IPC [2021/46] | G11C7/22 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/46] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DOPPELDATENRATENSCHALTUNG UND DATENERZEUGUNGSVERFAHREN ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG VON PRÄZISER TASTVERHÄLTNISSTEUERUNG | [2021/46] | English: | DOUBLE DATA RATE CIRCUIT AND DATA GENERATION METHOD IMPLEMENTING PRECISE DUTY CYCLE CONTROL | [2021/46] | French: | CIRCUIT À DOUBLE DÉBIT DE DONNÉES ET PROCÉDÉ DE GÉNÉRATION DE DONNÉES METTANT EN OEUVRE UNE COMMANDE PRÉCISE DE CYCLE DE SERVICE | [2021/46] | Entry into regional phase | 12.08.2021 | National basic fee paid | 12.08.2021 | Search fee paid | 12.08.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.08.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.08.2021 | Examination requested [2021/46] | 21.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.08.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 25.08.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.08.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP23193470.4 / EP4254804 | Opposition(s) | 05.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.06.2022 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   01.06.2022 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.10.2023 | CZ | 04.10.2023 | DK | 04.10.2023 | EE | 04.10.2023 | ES | 04.10.2023 | HR | 04.10.2023 | IT | 04.10.2023 | LT | 04.10.2023 | LV | 04.10.2023 | NL | 04.10.2023 | PL | 04.10.2023 | RO | 04.10.2023 | RS | 04.10.2023 | SE | 04.10.2023 | SK | 04.10.2023 | SM | 04.10.2023 | BG | 04.01.2024 | NO | 04.01.2024 | GR | 05.01.2024 | IS | 04.02.2024 | PT | 05.02.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 04.10.2023 | |
CZ | 04.10.2023 | ||
DK | 04.10.2023 | ||
EE | 04.10.2023 | ||
ES | 04.10.2023 | ||
HR | 04.10.2023 | ||
LT | 04.10.2023 | ||
LV | 04.10.2023 | ||
NL | 04.10.2023 | ||
PL | 04.10.2023 | ||
RO | 04.10.2023 | ||
RS | 04.10.2023 | ||
SE | 04.10.2023 | ||
SM | 04.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
NO | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
PT | 05.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | AT | 04.10.2023 | |
DK | 04.10.2023 | ||
EE | 04.10.2023 | ||
ES | 04.10.2023 | ||
HR | 04.10.2023 | ||
LT | 04.10.2023 | ||
LV | 04.10.2023 | ||
NL | 04.10.2023 | ||
PL | 04.10.2023 | ||
RS | 04.10.2023 | ||
SE | 04.10.2023 | ||
SM | 04.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
NO | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
PT | 05.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 04.10.2023 | |
DK | 04.10.2023 | ||
ES | 04.10.2023 | ||
HR | 04.10.2023 | ||
LT | 04.10.2023 | ||
LV | 04.10.2023 | ||
NL | 04.10.2023 | ||
PL | 04.10.2023 | ||
RS | 04.10.2023 | ||
SE | 04.10.2023 | ||
SM | 04.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
NO | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
PT | 05.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 04.10.2023 | |
ES | 04.10.2023 | ||
HR | 04.10.2023 | ||
LT | 04.10.2023 | ||
LV | 04.10.2023 | ||
NL | 04.10.2023 | ||
PL | 04.10.2023 | ||
RS | 04.10.2023 | ||
SE | 04.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
NO | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
PT | 05.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 04.10.2023 | |
ES | 04.10.2023 | ||
HR | 04.10.2023 | ||
LT | 04.10.2023 | ||
NL | 04.10.2023 | ||
PL | 04.10.2023 | ||
RS | 04.10.2023 | ||
SE | 04.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
NO | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
PT | 05.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 04.10.2023 | |
ES | 04.10.2023 | ||
LT | 04.10.2023 | ||
NL | 04.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
PT | 05.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 04.10.2023 | |
NL | 04.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | NL | 04.10.2023 | |
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/17] | NL | 04.10.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [IA]US2007194956 (JEON YOUNG-JIN [KR]) [I] 1-3,5-11,14,15 * paragraphs [0013] - [0019]; figures 1, 2 * [A] 4,12,13; | [IA]US2014056085 (KANG TAE WOOK [KR], et al) [I] 1-3,5-11,14,15 * paragraphs [0003] , [0 17] - [0030]; figures 1-4 *[A] 4,12,13 | International search | [A]US8901978 (MA YANTAO [US]) [A] 1-18* the whole document *; | [A]US10249354 (LEE HYUN YOO [US], et al) [A] 1-18 * the whole document *; | [A]CN109643990 (MICRON TECHNOLOGY INC) [A] 1-18 * the whole document * | by applicant | US2007194956 | US2014056085 |