EP3966972 - METHOD AND NETWORK DEVICE FOR LINK ADAPTATION USING ACK AND NACK FEEDBACK STATISTICS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2022/11] | METHOD AND NETWORK DEVICE FOR LINK ADAPTATION | ||
[2023/52] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 31.05.2024 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.12.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.02.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [2024/27] |
Former [2022/11] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FAN, Rui No. 5 Lize East Street, Chaoyang District Beijing 100102 / CN | 02 /
ZHU, Huaisong No. 5 Lize East Street, Chaoyang District Beijing 100102 / CN | 03 /
YUEN, Chi Chuen No. 5 Lize East Street, Chaoyang District Beijing 100102 / CN | [2022/11] | Representative(s) | Ericsson Patent Development Torshamnsgatan 21-23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | [2024/27] |
Former [2022/11] | Valea AB Box 7086 103 87 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 19928398.7 | 10.05.2019 | [2022/11] | WO2019CN86419 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020227854 | Date: | 19.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3966972 | Date: | 16.03.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.11.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3966972 | Date: | 03.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 19.11.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.04.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04L1/00 | [2022/11] | CPC: |
H04L1/16 (EP);
H04W72/542 (US);
H04L1/0003 (EP);
H04L1/0009 (EP);
H04L1/0019 (EP);
H04L1/0034 (EP);
H04L1/1607 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/11] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND NETZWERKVORRICHTUNG ZUR VERBINDUNGSANPASSUNG UNTER VERWENDUNG VON STATISTIKEN ÜBER ACK- UND NACK-RÜCKMELDUNGEN | [2023/52] | English: | METHOD AND NETWORK DEVICE FOR LINK ADAPTATION USING ACK AND NACK FEEDBACK STATISTICS | [2023/52] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE RÉSEAU POUR ADAPTATION DE LIAISON UTILISANT DES STATISTIQUES DE RETOUR D'ACK ET DE NACK | [2023/52] |
Former [2022/11] | VERFAHREN UND NETZWERKVORRICHTUNG ZUR VERBINDUNGSANPASSUNG | ||
Former [2022/11] | METHOD AND NETWORK DEVICE FOR LINK ADAPTATION | ||
Former [2022/11] | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE RÉSEAU D'ADAPTATION DE LIAISON | Entry into regional phase | 14.11.2021 | National basic fee paid | 14.11.2021 | Search fee paid | 14.11.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.11.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.11.2021 | Examination requested [2022/11] | 24.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.12.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.04.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 09.04.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.04.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2010135320 (TU YUNG SZU [TW], et al); | [XA]US2010190457 (TU YUNG-SZU [TW], et al); | International search | [A]CN1503469 (NTT DOCOMO INC [JP]); | [X]EP2139141 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]); | [X]CN101686098 (FUJITSU LTD); | [A]WO2010083661 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN], et al) | by applicant | US2010135320 | US2010190457 |