EP3974683 - GEAR SHIFT CONTROL METHOD AND GEAR SHIFT CONTROL SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.05.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.04.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.12.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.02.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NISSAN MOTOR Co., Ltd. 2 Takara-cho, Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 221-0023 / JP | [2022/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHIMOYAMA, Hiroki c/o Nissan Motor Co., Ltd. Intellectual Property Department, 1-1, Morinosatoaoyama Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa 243-0123 / JP | 02 /
UENO, Munetoshi c/o Nissan Motor Co., Ltd. Intellectual Property Department, 1-1, Morinosatoaoyama Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa 243-0123 / JP | 03 /
SUZUKI, Takefumi c/o Nissan Motor Co., Ltd. Intellectual Property Department, 1-1, Morinosatoaoyama Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa 243-0123 / JP | [2022/13] | Representative(s) | Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Pilgersheimer Straße 20 81543 München / DE | [2022/13] | Application number, filing date | 19929201.2 | 20.05.2019 | [2022/13] | WO2019JP19932 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020234974 | Date: | 26.11.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3974683 | Date: | 30.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3974683 | Date: | 28.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 26.11.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F16H61/02, // F16H59/40, F16H59/48 | [2023/18] | CPC: |
F16H61/0403 (EP);
F16H59/50 (US);
B60K6/387 (EP);
B60K6/48 (EP);
B60K6/52 (EP);
B60K6/547 (EP);
B60W10/023 (EP);
B60W10/06 (EP);
B60W10/08 (EP);
B60W10/11 (EP);
B60W10/26 (EP);
B60W20/30 (EP);
B60W20/40 (EP);
B60W30/18072 (EP);
B60W30/19 (EP);
F16H59/40 (US);
B60K2006/4825 (EP);
B60W2050/0052 (EP);
B60W2510/0638 (EP);
B60W2510/1015 (EP);
B60W2510/104 (EP);
B60W2510/244 (EP);
B60W2520/10 (EP);
B60W2540/10 (EP);
B60W2540/103 (EP);
B60W2710/0605 (EP);
B60W2710/0616 (EP);
B60W2710/081 (EP);
B60W2710/248 (EP);
B60Y2200/92 (EP);
F16H2059/186 (US);
F16H2061/0422 (EP,US);
F16H2061/0496 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2022/13] | F16H61/02, F16H59/40, F16H59/48, F16H61/04, F16H63/50 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/13] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHALTSTEUERUNGSVERFAHREN UND SCHALTSTEUERUNGSSYSTEM | [2022/13] | English: | GEAR SHIFT CONTROL METHOD AND GEAR SHIFT CONTROL SYSTEM | [2022/13] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DE CHANGEMENT DE VITESSE ET SYSTÈME DE COMMANDE DE CHANGEMENT DE VITESSE | [2022/13] | Entry into regional phase | 22.11.2021 | Translation filed | 22.11.2021 | National basic fee paid | 22.11.2021 | Search fee paid | 22.11.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.11.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.11.2019 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 22.11.2021 | Examination requested [2022/13] | 30.08.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.12.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.03.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.04.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.05.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 22.05.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.05.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 02.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.06.2023 | CZ | 28.06.2023 | DK | 28.06.2023 | EE | 28.06.2023 | ES | 28.06.2023 | FI | 28.06.2023 | HR | 28.06.2023 | IT | 28.06.2023 | LT | 28.06.2023 | LV | 28.06.2023 | NL | 28.06.2023 | PL | 28.06.2023 | RO | 28.06.2023 | RS | 28.06.2023 | SE | 28.06.2023 | SI | 28.06.2023 | SK | 28.06.2023 | SM | 28.06.2023 | NO | 28.09.2023 | GR | 29.09.2023 | IS | 28.10.2023 | PT | 30.10.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/26] | AT | 28.06.2023 | |
CZ | 28.06.2023 | ||
DK | 28.06.2023 | ||
EE | 28.06.2023 | ||
ES | 28.06.2023 | ||
FI | 28.06.2023 | ||
HR | 28.06.2023 | ||
IT | 28.06.2023 | ||
LT | 28.06.2023 | ||
LV | 28.06.2023 | ||
NL | 28.06.2023 | ||
PL | 28.06.2023 | ||
RO | 28.06.2023 | ||
RS | 28.06.2023 | ||
SE | 28.06.2023 | ||
SK | 28.06.2023 | ||
SM | 28.06.2023 | ||
NO | 28.09.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
IS | 28.10.2023 | ||
PT | 30.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 28.06.2023 | |
CZ | 28.06.2023 | ||
DK | 28.06.2023 | ||
EE | 28.06.2023 | ||
ES | 28.06.2023 | ||
FI | 28.06.2023 | ||
HR | 28.06.2023 | ||
LT | 28.06.2023 | ||
LV | 28.06.2023 | ||
NL | 28.06.2023 | ||
PL | 28.06.2023 | ||
RO | 28.06.2023 | ||
RS | 28.06.2023 | ||
SE | 28.06.2023 | ||
SK | 28.06.2023 | ||
SM | 28.06.2023 | ||
NO | 28.09.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
IS | 28.10.2023 | ||
PT | 30.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 28.06.2023 | |
CZ | 28.06.2023 | ||
EE | 28.06.2023 | ||
ES | 28.06.2023 | ||
FI | 28.06.2023 | ||
HR | 28.06.2023 | ||
LT | 28.06.2023 | ||
LV | 28.06.2023 | ||
NL | 28.06.2023 | ||
PL | 28.06.2023 | ||
RO | 28.06.2023 | ||
RS | 28.06.2023 | ||
SE | 28.06.2023 | ||
SK | 28.06.2023 | ||
SM | 28.06.2023 | ||
NO | 28.09.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
IS | 28.10.2023 | ||
PT | 30.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 28.06.2023 | |
CZ | 28.06.2023 | ||
ES | 28.06.2023 | ||
FI | 28.06.2023 | ||
HR | 28.06.2023 | ||
LT | 28.06.2023 | ||
LV | 28.06.2023 | ||
NL | 28.06.2023 | ||
RS | 28.06.2023 | ||
SE | 28.06.2023 | ||
SK | 28.06.2023 | ||
SM | 28.06.2023 | ||
NO | 28.09.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
IS | 28.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | FI | 28.06.2023 | |
HR | 28.06.2023 | ||
LT | 28.06.2023 | ||
LV | 28.06.2023 | ||
NL | 28.06.2023 | ||
RS | 28.06.2023 | ||
SE | 28.06.2023 | ||
SK | 28.06.2023 | ||
SM | 28.06.2023 | ||
NO | 28.09.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | FI | 28.06.2023 | |
HR | 28.06.2023 | ||
LT | 28.06.2023 | ||
LV | 28.06.2023 | ||
NL | 28.06.2023 | ||
RS | 28.06.2023 | ||
SE | 28.06.2023 | ||
NO | 28.09.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | HR | 28.06.2023 | |
LT | 28.06.2023 | ||
LV | 28.06.2023 | ||
NL | 28.06.2023 | ||
RS | 28.06.2023 | ||
SE | 28.06.2023 | ||
NO | 28.09.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/52] | HR | 28.06.2023 | |
NL | 28.06.2023 | ||
RS | 28.06.2023 | ||
SE | 28.06.2023 | ||
NO | 28.09.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | HR | 28.06.2023 | |
RS | 28.06.2023 | ||
SE | 28.06.2023 | ||
NO | 28.09.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | SE | 28.06.2023 | |
NO | 28.09.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | SE | 28.06.2023 | |
NO | 28.09.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2008312035 (MURAYAMA MASAMI [JP], et al) [A] 1-6 * paragraphs [0034] - [0073]; figures 5-8 *; | [A]EP2233791 (JATCO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-6 * figures 1-14 * * paragraphs [0058] - [0085] *; | [A]WO2010146677 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-6 * figures 10,11 * * paragraphs [0046] - [0051] *; | [A]US8788166 (KUCHARSKI JOSEPH F [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * figures 1-5 ** claim 1 * | International search | [Y]JPH1191396 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [Y] 4-5 * , *; | [Y]JP2008075718 (MITSUBISHI FUSO TRUCK & BUS) [Y] 2, 4-5 * , *; | [A]JP2010007491 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [A] 1-6* , *; | [XYA]WO2010146677 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1, 6 [Y] 2, 4-5 [A] 3; | [Y]JP2011133069 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [Y] 2, 4-5 * , *; | [Y]WO2017057757 (AISIN AW CO [JP]) [Y] 2, 4-5 | by applicant | JP2007112350 |