EP3973364 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR DETERMINING A HEALTH CONDITION AND AN ANOMALY OF AN EQUIPMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.02.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Jef Techno Solutions Pvt Ltd No. 1073, K R Square (2nd & 3rd Floor), 15th Cross 30th Main, Banashankari 2nd Stage Bengaluru 560070 / IN | [2022/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAO, Prashanth Belur Gururaja No.57, Anugraha , 5th Main, Padmanabha Nagar Bangalore 560070 / IN | [2022/13] | Representative(s) | Basck Limited WeWork 50-60 Station Rd Cambridge CB1 2JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/13] | Basck Ltd WeWork 50-60 Station Rd Cambridge CB1 2JH / GB | Application number, filing date | 19929862.1 | 25.10.2019 | [2022/13] | WO2019IN50786 | Priority number, date | IN201941019900 | 20.05.2019 Original published format: IN201941019900 | [2022/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020234894 | Date: | 26.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3973364 | Date: | 30.03.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.11.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | IN | 26.11.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.10.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/418, G05B19/04, G05B23/02 | [2023/47] | CPC: |
G05B23/024 (EP);
G05B23/0283 (US);
G05B23/0232 (US);
G05B2219/24058 (EP);
G05B2219/24097 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2022/13] | G05B19/418, G05B19/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/13] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG EINES GESUNDHEITSZUSTANDS UND EINER ANOMALIE EINER AUSRÜSTUNG | [2022/13] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR DETERMINING A HEALTH CONDITION AND AN ANOMALY OF AN EQUIPMENT | [2022/13] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTERMINATION D'UN ÉTAT DE SANTÉ ET D'UNE ANOMALIE D'UN ÉQUIPEMENT | [2022/13] | Entry into regional phase | 15.09.2021 | National basic fee paid | 15.09.2021 | Search fee paid | 15.09.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.09.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.09.2021 | Examination requested [2022/13] | 10.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US7002462 (WELCH PATRICK J [US]) [A] 1-10* the whole document *; | [A]US2016284073 (MICHALSCHECK JIMI R [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [I]US2016292846 (SPROCK CHRISTOPHER [US], et al) [I] 1,7 * paragraphs [0005] , [0017] , [0018] , [0022] * * paragraphs [0025] - [0030] * * paragraphs [0034] , [0036] - [0039] - [0042] - [0047] * * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0060] * * paragraph [0067] - paragraph [0076] * * paragraph [0088] * * figures 1-6 *; | [I]US2017032281 (HSU CHRISTOPHER [US]) [I] 1-10 * paragraph [0066] - paragraph [0068] * * paragraph [0071] - paragraph [0079] * * paragraphs [0083] , [0084] , [0087] , [0088] * * paragraph [0091] - paragraph [0095] * * paragraph [0098] - paragraph [0101] * * paragraph [0109] - paragraph [0116] * * paragraph [0151] * * figures 2,4a,4b,4c,4d,4e,5 * | International search | [X]US7002462 (WELCH PATRICK J [US]) [X] 1-10 * ABSTRACT; FIGS. 1, 4; CLAIMS 1, 2, 6, 10-13; COL.3, LINE 10- LINE 15; COL.5, LINE 10- COL.5, LINE 65; COL.7, LINE 60-COL.8, LINE 25 *; | [X]CN109062096 (CHONGQING CONSTRUCTION RESIDENTIAL ENGINEERING CO LTD, et al) [X] 1-10* ABSTRACT; FIG. 1; CLAIMS 1, 3, 5 * |