EP3927119 - DRIVE CONTROL CIRCUIT, DRIVE CONTROL CHIP, INTEGRATED PACKAGING DEVICE, DISPLAY SYSTEM AND SPARSITY-DRIVEN METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.05.2024 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.11.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | 17.05.2024 | First examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Faith Billion Technology Development Limited 10F Mutual Tower 33 Lockhart Road Wanchai, Hong Kong 999077 / HK | [2021/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LU, Zengxiang Room 401, Unit 4, 21 Dormitory Of Tsinghua University, Haidian District Beijing 100084 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2021/51] | 01 /
LU, Zengxiang Beijing 100084 / CN | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Joachimsthaler Straße 10-12 10719 Berlin / DE | [2021/51] | Application number, filing date | 19931460.0 | 19.09.2019 | [2021/51] | WO2019CN106704 | Priority number, date | CN201910438774 | 24.05.2019 Original published format: CN201910438774 | [2021/51] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020237924 | Date: | 03.12.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3927119 | Date: | 22.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 03.12.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/32, G09G3/20, H01L27/15, H04N13/32, // G09G3/00, G03H1/22 | [2022/47] | CPC: |
G09G3/32 (EP,CN,US);
G06F3/013 (US);
G09G3/005 (EP);
G09G3/2088 (EP);
H04N13/307 (EP);
H05B45/10 (CN);
G02B30/33 (EP);
G09G2310/0275 (EP,US);
G09G2310/0291 (US);
G09G2310/0297 (EP);
G09G2310/08 (EP,US);
G09G2340/0435 (EP);
G09G2350/00 (EP);
G09G2354/00 (EP);
G09G2370/08 (EP);
G09G3/002 (EP);
G09G3/003 (EP);
H01L25/0753 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2021/51] | H05B33/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/51] | Title | German: | ANTRIEBSSTEUERSCHALTUNG, ANTRIEBSSTEUERCHIP, INTEGRIERTE VERPACKUNGSVORRICHTUNG, ANZEIGESYSTEM UND SPÄRLICHKEITSGESTEUERTES VERFAHREN | [2021/51] | English: | DRIVE CONTROL CIRCUIT, DRIVE CONTROL CHIP, INTEGRATED PACKAGING DEVICE, DISPLAY SYSTEM AND SPARSITY-DRIVEN METHOD | [2021/51] | French: | CIRCUIT ET PUCE DE COMMANDE D'ENTRAÎNEMENT, DISPOSITIF D'ENCAPSULATION INTÉGRÉ, SYSTÈME D'AFFICHAGE ET PROCÉDÉ COMMANDÉ PAR LA RARETÉ | [2021/51] | Entry into regional phase | 13.09.2021 | Translation filed | 13.09.2021 | National basic fee paid | 13.09.2021 | Search fee paid | 13.09.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.09.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.09.2021 | Examination requested [2021/51] | 09.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.05.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2014168037 (SAKARIYA KAPIL V [US], et al) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0052] - [0056]; figures 10,11 *; | [A]US2018211582 (SAKARIYA KAPIL V [US], et al) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0057] , [0067] , [0071]; figures 1-6 *; | [I]US2019147793 (VALENTINE GARETH JOHN [GB]) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0023] - [0027] - [0038] , [0045]; figures 2A, 2B, 3A, 3B,5 *; | [A] - Anonymous, "TLC5973 3-Channel, 12-Bit, PWM Constant-Current LED Driver with Single-Wire Interface (EasySet(TM))", (20140531), pages 1 - 38, URL: https://www.ti.com/lit/ds/symlink/tlc5973.pdf?ts=1653919933115&ref_url=https%3A%2F%2Fwww.ti.com%2Fproduct%2FTLC5973, (20220601), XP055927008 [A] 1-5 * pages 1,10,11 * |