EP3979694 - TERMINAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.03.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NTT DOCOMO, INC. 11-1 Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-Ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | [2022/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOSHIOKA, Shohei c/o Intellectual Property Department NTT DOCOMO INC. SANNO PARK TOWER, 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 02 /
NAGATA, Satoshi c/o Intellectual Property Department NTT DOCOMO INC. SANNO PARK TOWER, 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 03 /
WANG, Yanru c/o DOCOMO Beijing Communications Laboratories Co. Ltd. 7/F, Raycom Infotech Park A, No.2 Kexueyuan South Road, Haidian District Beijing, 100190 / CN | [2022/14] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2022/14] | Application number, filing date | 19931659.7 | 03.06.2019 | [2022/14] | WO2019JP22059 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020245895 | Date: | 10.12.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3979694 | Date: | 06.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 10.12.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04W28/04, H04W4/46, H04W92/18, H04L5/00, H04L1/18, H04L1/00 | [2023/03] | CPC: |
H04L1/1861 (EP);
H04W72/02 (US);
H04L1/08 (US);
H04L5/0037 (EP);
H04L5/0053 (US);
H04L5/0055 (EP);
H04W4/46 (EP);
H04W72/0446 (US);
H04W72/20 (US);
|
Former IPC [2022/14] | H04W28/04, H04W4/46, H04W92/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/14] | Title | German: | ENDGERÄT | [2022/14] | English: | TERMINAL | [2022/14] | French: | TERMINAL | [2022/14] | Entry into regional phase | 07.12.2021 | Translation filed | 07.12.2021 | National basic fee paid | 07.12.2021 | Search fee paid | 07.12.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.12.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/14] | 30.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |