EP3983097 - PREDICTIVE DATA PRELOADING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.03.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.10.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Roblox Corporation 970 Park Place San Mateo, CA 94403 / US | [2022/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KERR, John 970 Park Place San Mateo, CA 94403 / US | [2022/16] | Representative(s) | Betten & Resch Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Maximiliansplatz 14 80333 München / DE | [2022/16] | Application number, filing date | 19933098.6 | 24.09.2019 | [2022/16] | WO2019US52804 | Priority number, date | US201916442328 | 14.06.2019 Original published format: US201916442328 | [2022/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020251608 | Date: | 17.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3983097 | Date: | 20.04.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.12.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 17.12.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.06.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A63F9/24, A63F13/67, A63F13/358, A63F13/48, A63F13/77, A63F13/79, G06N3/08, H04L67/306, H04L67/00, G06N20/00 | [2023/28] | CPC: |
H04L67/306 (EP,KR);
A63F13/358 (EP,KR,US);
A63F13/79 (EP,KR,US);
A63F13/45 (US);
A63F13/48 (EP,KR);
A63F13/533 (EP,KR);
A63F13/63 (EP,KR);
A63F13/67 (EP,KR);
A63F13/77 (EP,KR,US);
G06N20/00 (KR);
G06N3/0464 (EP,KR);
G06N3/088 (EP,KR);
G06N3/0895 (EP,KR);
G06N3/09 (EP,KR);
G06N3/092 (EP,KR);
H04L67/34 (EP,KR);
A63F2300/534 (US);
A63F2300/5546 (US);
|
Former IPC [2022/16] | A63F9/24 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/16] | Title | German: | PRÄDIKTIVES DATENVORLADEN | [2022/16] | English: | PREDICTIVE DATA PRELOADING | [2022/16] | French: | PRÉCHARGEMENT DE DONNÉES PRÉDICTIVES | [2022/16] | Entry into regional phase | 14.01.2022 | National basic fee paid | 14.01.2022 | Search fee paid | 14.01.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.01.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.01.2022 | Examination requested [2022/16] | 03.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2013137518 (LUCAS KEITH V [US]); | [A]US2016166932 (CHHAOCHHARIA NIKHIL [IN], et al); | [A]US2016256784 (SCHULTZ PAUL ROBERT [US], et al); | [I]US2019001219 (SARDARI MOHSEN [US], et al); | [I]EP3486769 (GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP LTD [CN]) | International search | [XY]US2009093290 (LUTNICK HOWARD W [US], et al); | [A]US2015141152 (JUSTICE JOHN RAYMOND [US], et al); | [Y]US2016256784 (SCHULTZ PAUL ROBERT [US], et al); | [A]US2017282063 (KRISHNAMURTHY SUDHA [US]) |