EP4024463 - DISPLAY SUBSTRATE AND PREPARATION METHOD THEREOF, AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.06.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.03.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 21.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BOE Technology Group Co., Ltd. No. 10 Jiuxianqiao Rd. Chaoyang District Beijing 100015 / CN | [2022/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHEN, Xiaobin No.9 Dize Rd. BDA Beijing 100176 / CN | 02 /
WANG, Yu No.9 Dize Rd. BDA Beijing 100176 / CN | [2022/27] | Representative(s) | Brötz, Helmut, et al Rieder & Partner mbB Patentanwälte - Rechtsanwalt Yale-Allee 26 42329 Wuppertal / DE | [2022/27] | Application number, filing date | 19933205.7 | 27.08.2019 | [2022/27] | WO2019CN102890 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021035549 | Date: | 04.03.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4024463 | Date: | 06.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 04.03.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H01L27/32, H01L51/52, H01L51/56 | [2022/27] | CPC: |
H10K59/1315 (EP,US);
H10K50/858 (US);
H10K50/844 (US);
H10K59/131 (EP);
H10K59/38 (EP,US);
H10K71/00 (US);
H10K2102/341 (EP);
H10K59/1201 (US);
H10K59/871 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/27] | Title | German: | ANZEIGESUBSTRAT UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR SOWIE ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG | [2022/27] | English: | DISPLAY SUBSTRATE AND PREPARATION METHOD THEREOF, AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE | [2022/27] | French: | SUBSTRAT D'AFFICHAGE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION, ET DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2022/27] | Entry into regional phase | 21.12.2020 | Translation filed | 21.12.2020 | National basic fee paid | 21.12.2020 | Search fee paid | 21.12.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.12.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.12.2020 | Examination requested [2022/27] | 07.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.03.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]JP2007157470 (SEIKO EPSON CORP); | [XYI]EP2019432 (SAMSUNG SDI CO LTD [KR]); | [Y]EP2562742 (SONY CORP [JP]); | [Y]US2016064467 (OTA HITOSHI [JP], et al); | [XYI]EP3229287 (SAMSUNG DISPLAY CO LTD [KR]); | [XYI]EP3522229 (SAMSUNG DISPLAY CO LTD [KR]) |