EP3989468 - RECEIVING STATE FEEDBACK METHOD AND DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.03.2022 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Beijing Xiaomi Mobile Software Co., Ltd. No. 018, Floor 8, Building 6, Yard 33 Middle Xierqi Road Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | [2022/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DONG, Xiandong No.018, Floor 8, Building 6, Yard 33, Middle Xierqi Road, Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | [2022/17] | Representative(s) | Hughes, Andrea Michelle Dehns Germany Theresienstraße 6-8 80333 München / DE | [2022/17] | Application number, filing date | 19934220.5 | 20.06.2019 | [2022/17] | WO2019CN92076 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020252741 | Date: | 24.12.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3989468 | Date: | 27.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 24.12.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.03.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04L1/16, H04W4/00 | [2022/17] | CPC: |
H04L1/1614 (EP);
H04L5/0094 (US);
H04L5/0044 (US);
H04L2001/0093 (EP);
H04W84/12 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/17] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR EMPFANGSSTATUSRÜCKKOPPLUNG | [2022/17] | English: | RECEIVING STATE FEEDBACK METHOD AND DEVICE | [2022/17] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE RÉTROACTION D'ÉTAT DE RÉCEPTION | [2022/17] | Entry into regional phase | 13.01.2022 | Translation filed | 13.01.2022 | National basic fee paid | 13.01.2022 | Search fee paid | 13.01.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.01.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.01.2022 | Examination requested [2022/17] | 09.10.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2017111951 (CHU LIWEN [US], et al) [X] 6,14 * figures 2B, 3A, 3B * * paragraphs [0049] , [ 0057] - [0063] *; | [X]US2018138959 (CHUN JINYOUNG [KR], et al) [X] 6,14 * paragraphs [0450] - [0460] *; | [X]US2018184233 (ALPERT YARON [IL], et al) [X] 1-5,7-13,15 * figures 1, 3, 4A, 4C, 4D, 6 * * paragraphs [0002] , [ 0021] - [0024] * * paragraphs [0034] - [0051] *; | [E]WO2020112020 (PANASONIC IP CORP AMERICA [US]) [E] 1-5,7-13,15 * figures 5, 13, 17, 19 * * paragraphs [0046] - [0052] * * paragraphs [0068] - [0070] - [ 0086] * * paragraphs [0087] - [0008] *; | [E]EP3940977 (SONY GROUP CORP [JP]) [E] 1-5,7-13,15 * figures 2, 9 * * paragraphs [0018] - [0023] * * paragraphs [0151] - [0160] *; | [A] - MING GAN (HUAWEI), "Association Exchange using Contention based UL OFDMA", vol. 802.11ax, no. 3, (20170316), pages 1 - 15, IEEE DRAFT; 11-17-0396-03-00AX-ASSOCIATION-EXCHANGE-USING-CONTENTION-BASED-UL-OFDMA, IEEE-SA MENTOR, PISCATAWAY, NJ USA, URL: https://mentor.ieee.org/802.11/dcn/17/11-17-0396-03-00ax-association-exchange-using-contention-based-ul-ofdma.pptx, (20170316), XP068115496 [A] 6,14 * pages 2-5 * | International search | [A]WO2010066067 (ALCATEL SHANGHAI BELL CO LTD [CN], et al) [A] 1-18,* entire document *; | [A]CN106656429 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-18, * entire document *; | [A]CN107294665 (BEIJING SAMSUNG TELECOM R&D CT, et al) [A] 1-18, * entire document *; | [X]US2018184233 (ALPERT YARON [IL], et al) [X] 1-18, * description, paragraphs [0021]-[0075], and figures 1-8 *; | [A]WO2019056369 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [A] 1-18, * entire document * |