EP3993592 - COMPONENT MOUNTING MACHINE AND SUBSTRATE WORK SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.07.2024 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.06.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.11.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.04.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fuji Corporation 19, Chausuyama Yamamachi Chiryu-shi, Aichi 472-8686 / JP | [2022/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOKOI, Yuta c/o FUJI CORPORATION, 19, Chausuyama, Yamamachi Chiryu-shi, Aichi 472-8686 / JP | 02 /
KOTANI, Kazuya c/o FUJI CORPORATION, 19, Chausuyama, Yamamachi Chiryu-shi, Aichi 472-8686 / JP | 03 /
SUZUKI, Mikiya c/o FUJI CORPORATION, 19, Chausuyama, Yamamachi Chiryu-shi, Aichi 472-8686 / JP | [2022/18] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2022/18] | Application number, filing date | 19935230.3 | 27.06.2019 | [2022/18] | WO2019JP25611 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020261489 | Date: | 30.12.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/53] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3993592 | Date: | 04.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3993592 | Date: | 28.08.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 30.12.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H05K13/08, H05K13/00 | [2022/18] | CPC: |
H05K13/0813 (EP);
G06T7/0006 (US);
G06V10/62 (US);
H05K13/083 (EP);
G06T2207/30152 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BAUTEILMONTAGEMASCHINE UND SUBSTRATBEARBEITUNGSSYSTEM | [2022/18] | English: | COMPONENT MOUNTING MACHINE AND SUBSTRATE WORK SYSTEM | [2022/18] | French: | MACHINE DE MONTAGE DE COMPOSANT ET SYSTÈME DE TRAVAIL DE SUBSTRAT | [2022/18] | Entry into regional phase | 08.12.2021 | Translation filed | 08.12.2021 | National basic fee paid | 08.12.2021 | Search fee paid | 08.12.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.12.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/18] | 28.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.12.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.11.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.03.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.06.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.07.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 18.07.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.07.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]JP4758263B | International search | [A]JP2008098411 (JUKI KK); | [A]JP2012204455 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | [A]WO2016139753 (FUJI MACHINE MFG [JP]); | [A]JP2017220544 (FUJI MACHINE MFG); | [A]WO2018087932 (FUJI CORP [JP]); | [A]JP2018190785 (FUJI CORP) | by applicant | WO2016092651 |