EP3987657 - POWER AMPLIFIER WITH LARGE OUTPUT POWER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.03.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [2022/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAO, Mingquan Citrusgatan 27 426 54 Västra Frölunda / SE | [2022/17] | Representative(s) | Ericsson Patent Development Torshamnsgatan 21-23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | [2022/17] | Application number, filing date | 19935336.8 | 24.06.2019 | [2022/17] | WO2019SE50604 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020263134 | Date: | 30.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/53] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3987657 | Date: | 27.04.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.12.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 30.12.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H03F1/18, H03F1/56, H03F3/60, H03H7/38 | [2022/27] | CPC: |
H03F3/607 (EP,US);
H03F1/18 (EP,US);
H03F1/565 (EP,US);
H03F3/245 (US);
H03F2200/246 (EP);
H03F2200/423 (US);
|
Former IPC [2022/17] | H03F3/60, H03F1/56, H03H7/38, H03F3/189 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/17] | Title | German: | LEISTUNGSVERSTÄRKER MIT GROSSER AUSGANGSLEISTUNG | [2022/17] | English: | POWER AMPLIFIER WITH LARGE OUTPUT POWER | [2022/17] | French: | AMPLIFICATEUR DE PUISSANCE À GRANDE PUISSANCE DE SORTIE | [2022/17] | Entry into regional phase | 11.01.2022 | National basic fee paid | 11.01.2022 | Search fee paid | 11.01.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.01.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.01.2022 | Examination requested [2022/17] | 07.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]US3210682 (MARIAN SOSIN BOLESLAW) [X] 1,7,9,11 * column 1 - column 3; figure 1 * [A] 2-6,8 [I] 10,12,13; | [XI]EP3340463 (NXP USA INC [US]) [X] 1,2,6,7,9,11 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0134]; figures 1-14 * [I] 3-5,8,10,12,13; | [A] - ROSS M ET AL, "Taper and forward-feed in GaAs MMIC distributed amplifiers", 19890613; 19890613 - 19890615, (19890613), pages 1039 - 1042, XP010085754 [A] 1-13 * page 1039 - page 1042; figures 1-7 * | [A] - Rf Geek, "Tapped Capacitor Matching", (20181128), pages 1 - 3, URL: https://web.archive.org/web/20181128092023/https://analog.intgckts.com/impedance-matching/tapped-capacitor-matching/, (20220523), XP055923894 [A] 1-13 * page 1 - page 3 * | [A] - Rf Geek, "Tapped Inductor Matching", (20181219), pages 1 - 2, URL: https://web.archive.org/web/20181219124623/https://analog.intgckts.com/impedance-matching/tapped-inductor-matching/, (20220523), XP055923897 [A] 1-13 * page 1 - page 2 * | International search | [A]EP0401632 (ROCKWELL INTERNATIONAL CORP [US]) [A] 1-13 * ; abstract; figures 1-3b *; | [A]US5012203 (BEYER JAMES B [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * ; abstract; column 7, line 10 - line 47 *; | [A]US8035449 (KOBAYASHI KEVIN W [US]) [A] 1-13* ; abstract; all figures *; | [A]US2012274406 (KOBAYASHI KEVIN W [US]) [A] 1-13 * ; abstract; figure 3 *; | [YA]US2014266460 (NOBBE DAN WILLIAM [US], et al) [Y] 1-2, 6-13 * ; paragraphs [0076]-[0081], [0095]; figures 9C,10A,10F-G * [A] 3-5; | [A]EP3116122 (MEDIATEK INC [TW]) [A] 3-5 * ; paragraphs [0001 ], [0019]; all figures *; | [YA] - C. F. CAMPBELL, "Evolution of the nonuniform distributed power amplifier", IEEE Microwave Magazin e, (20190000), vol. 20, no. 1, doi:10.1109/MMM.2018.2875619, pages 18 - 27, XP011700820 [Y] 1-2, 6-13 * ; pages 20-22; figure 3 * [A] 3-5 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MMM.2018.2875619 | by applicant | US3210682 | EP3340463 |