EP3995547 - THERMALLY CURABLE INK-JET INK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.01.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.08.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.04.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KONICA MINOLTA, INC. 2-7-2, Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-7015 / JP | [2022/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KATSUDA, Ai c/o KONICA MINOLTA, INC. 2-7-2, Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-7015 / JP | [2024/06] |
Former [2022/19] | 01 /
KATSUDA, Ai c/o KONICA MINOLTA, INC., 2-7-2, Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-7015 / JP | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [2022/19] | Application number, filing date | 19936106.4 | 02.07.2019 | [2022/19] | WO2019JP26355 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021001937 | Date: | 07.01.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3995547 | Date: | 11.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3995547 | Date: | 07.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 07.01.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C09D11/30, C09D11/101, C09D11/102, C09D11/107, C09D11/34, C09D11/38 | [2022/29] | CPC: |
C09D11/34 (EP);
C09D11/38 (EP,US);
C09D11/101 (EP,US);
C09D11/102 (EP);
C09D11/107 (EP,US);
H05K1/092 (US)
|
Former IPC [2022/19] | C09D11/30 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/19] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | THERMISCH HÄRTBARE TINTENSTRAHLTINTE | [2022/19] | English: | THERMALLY CURABLE INK-JET INK | [2022/19] | French: | ENCRE À JET D'ENCRE THERMODURCISSABLE | [2022/19] | Entry into regional phase | 28.12.2021 | Translation filed | 28.12.2021 | National basic fee paid | 28.12.2021 | Search fee paid | 28.12.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.12.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/19] | 13.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.12.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.08.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.12.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 25.12.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.12.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.02.2024 | BG | 07.02.2024 | ES | 07.02.2024 | FI | 07.02.2024 | HR | 07.02.2024 | LT | 07.02.2024 | LV | 07.02.2024 | NL | 07.02.2024 | PL | 07.02.2024 | SE | 07.02.2024 | NO | 07.05.2024 | RS | 07.05.2024 | GR | 08.05.2024 | IS | 07.06.2024 | PT | 07.06.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/36] | AT | 07.02.2024 | |
BG | 07.02.2024 | ||
ES | 07.02.2024 | ||
FI | 07.02.2024 | ||
HR | 07.02.2024 | ||
LT | 07.02.2024 | ||
LV | 07.02.2024 | ||
NL | 07.02.2024 | ||
PL | 07.02.2024 | ||
NO | 07.05.2024 | ||
RS | 07.05.2024 | ||
GR | 08.05.2024 | ||
IS | 07.06.2024 | ||
PT | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | AT | 07.02.2024 | |
BG | 07.02.2024 | ||
ES | 07.02.2024 | ||
FI | 07.02.2024 | ||
HR | 07.02.2024 | ||
LT | 07.02.2024 | ||
NL | 07.02.2024 | ||
NO | 07.05.2024 | ||
RS | 07.05.2024 | ||
GR | 08.05.2024 | ||
IS | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 07.02.2024 | |
FI | 07.02.2024 | ||
HR | 07.02.2024 | ||
LT | 07.02.2024 | ||
NL | 07.02.2024 | ||
NO | 07.05.2024 | ||
RS | 07.05.2024 | ||
GR | 08.05.2024 | ||
IS | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 07.02.2024 | |
NO | 07.05.2024 | ||
IS | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | IS | 07.06.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2015064417 (CHOI SUNGHO [KR], et al); | [A]US2015322274 (CHANG HSIU-MING [TW], et al) | International search | [Y]JP2011057751 (CHISSO CORP); | [Y]JP2012521386 ; | [Y]JP2013203830 (UNION CHEMICAR CO LTD); | [Y]JP2016069580 (KONICA MINOLTA INC); | [Y]JP2016069571 (KONICA MINOLTA INC); | [Y]JP2017179130 (KONICA MINOLTA INC); | [X]WO2019021639 (FUJIFILM CORP [JP]) | by applicant | JPS4936725 | EP0004940 | EP0004973 | EP0005205 | EP0005208 | EP0005214 | EP0005221 | JPS573146B | JPS5969208 | JPH1036462 | JPH1121470 |