EP3982535 - RC OSCILLATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.03.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2022/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEN, Yanqin Huawei Administration Building, Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
WU, Chunbiao Huawei Administration Building, Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
LIU, Yongwang Huawei Administration Building, Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 04 /
ZHANG, Bingzhao Huawei Administration Building, Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2022/15] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2022/15] | Application number, filing date | 19936257.5 | 29.06.2019 | [2022/15] | WO2019CN93941 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021000064 | Date: | 07.01.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3982535 | Date: | 13.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 07.01.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H03B5/04, H03K3/013 | [2022/15] | CPC: |
H03K3/013 (EP);
H03L7/02 (US);
H03B5/26 (EP);
H03K3/0231 (EP);
H03B2200/009 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/15] | Title | German: | RC-OSZILLATOR | [2022/15] | English: | RC OSCILLATOR | [2022/15] | French: | OSCILLATEUR RC | [2022/15] | Entry into regional phase | 06.01.2022 | Translation filed | 06.01.2022 | National basic fee paid | 06.01.2022 | Search fee paid | 06.01.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.01.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.01.2022 | Examination requested [2022/15] | 24.01.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 03.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 03.04.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 03.04.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 13.04.2023 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0225815 (INFINEON TECHNOLOGIES AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-11 * page 1, line 6 - page 11, line 7; figures 1-3 *; | [IA]WO2015191000 (AGENCY SCIENCE TECH & RES [SG]) [I] 1-3 * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0125]; figures 1-9 * [A] 4-11; | [A]US2016094271 (KAWANO YOICHI [JP]) [A] 1-11* paragraph 16 - sentence 161; figures 1-18 * | International search | [A]US2013181760 (LIN YIJING [CN]) [A] 1-11* entire document *; | [A]CN103546121 (WUXI VIMICRO CORP) [A] 1-11 * entire document *; | [Y]CN104852769 (XIAMEN UX HIGH SPEED IC CO LTD) [Y] 1-3 * description, paragraphs 0017-0029, figure 3 *; | [A]CN107112947 (SHENZHEN HUIDING TECHNOLOGY CO) [A] 1-11 * entire document *; | [Y]CN108288962 (INST MICROELECTRONICS CAS) [Y] 1-3 * description, paragraphs 0047-0081, figures 2-10 * |