EP3994818 - IMPROVED RELAYING IN A WIRELESS COMMUNICATION NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.05.2024 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.06.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.04.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [2022/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAKKI, Behrooz Rådavägen 15B 435 43 Pixbo / SE | 02 /
COLDREY, Mikael Högvallagatan 9 504 58 Borås / SE | [2022/19] | Representative(s) | Ericsson Patent Development Torshamnsgatan 21-23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | [2022/19] | Application number, filing date | 19936262.5 | 01.07.2019 | [2022/19] | WO2019SE50650 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021002785 | Date: | 07.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3994818 | Date: | 11.05.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.01.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 07.01.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04L1/00, H04L1/18, H04W40/16, H04W40/22, H04L1/16, // H04W88/04 | [2022/27] | CPC: |
H04L1/1887 (EP);
H04L1/1816 (EP,US);
H04L1/0002 (EP,US);
H04L1/1671 (EP);
H04L1/1845 (EP,US);
H04W28/0236 (US);
H04W40/16 (EP);
H04W40/22 (EP);
H04W84/047 (US);
H04W88/04 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/19] | H04L1/18, H04W40/22, H04W88/04, H04W92/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/19] | Title | German: | VERBESSERTE WEITERLEITUNG IN EINEM DRAHTLOSKOMMUNIKATIONSNETZWERK | [2022/19] | English: | IMPROVED RELAYING IN A WIRELESS COMMUNICATION NETWORK | [2022/19] | French: | RELAIS AMÉLIORÉ DANS UN RÉSEAU DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL | [2022/19] | Entry into regional phase | 03.01.2022 | National basic fee paid | 03.01.2022 | Search fee paid | 03.01.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.01.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.01.2022 | Examination requested [2022/19] | 07.06.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.06.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.09.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.09.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.01.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/24] | 13.02.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2024/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1583270 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-19 * abstract ** page 10, paragraph 101 - page 13, paragraph 136 *; | [A] - AT&T, "Enhancements to support NR backhaul links", vol. RAN WG1, no. Chengdu, China; 20181008 - 20181012, (20181111), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1812859, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings%5F3GPP%5FSYNC/RAN1/Docs/R1%2D1812859%2Ezip, (20181111), XP051554822 [A] 1-19 * section 2 * | International search | [A]CN107302415 (CHINA MOBILE GROUP DESIGN INST, et al) [A] 1-19 * ; See English translation of abstract *; | [A]US2018070265 (SEO INKWON [KR], et al) [A] 1-19* ; abstract *; | [A]US2018092139 (NOVLAN THOMAS DAVID [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * ; abstract *; | [A]US2018124684 (KWON HWAN-JOON [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * ; abstract; paragraphs [0044]-[0046] *; | [A]US2019149303 (YILMAZ OSMAN NURI CAN [FI], et al) [A] 1-19 * ; abstract; paragraphs [0075]-[0078], [0085]-[0088] *; | [A] - HUAWEI, "Consideration on IAB physical layer enhancement", R1- 1720606, (20171127), URL: https://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_91/Docs, XP051370072 [A] 1-19 * ; abstract; figures 6-8; See Chapters 1 Introduction, 2.2 Dynamic/flexible resource allocation between backhaul and access, and 2.3 High spectrum efficiency backhaul link with high reliability * | [A] - AT&T, "Summary of 7.7.1 Enhancements to support NR backhaul links", R1 -1807769, (20180521), URL: https://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_93/Docsw, XP051442868 [A] 1-19 * ; abstract; See Chapters 1 Introduction and 4 Spectral Efficiency enhancements * | [A] - HASHEMI M , COLDREY MIKAEL et al., "Integrated Access and Backhaul in Fixed Wireless Access Systems", (20170924), URL: https://ieeexplore.ieee.org/document/8288233, XP033319835 [A] 1-19 * ; abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/VTCFall.2017.8288233 | by applicant | US2019149303 | - "Enhancements to support NR backhaul links", AT&T, 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1812859, Mobile Competence Center, (20181008), vol. RAN WG1 |