EP3997726 - FUSE APPARATUS WITH INTEGRATED SOLENOIDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.04.2022 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Suzhou Littelfuse OVS Co., Ltd. 6 Xinghai Street Suzhou Industrial Park Suzhou, Jiangsu 215155 / CN | [2022/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHENG, Du 6 Xinghai Street, Suzhou Industrial Park Suzhou, Jiangsu 215155 / CN | 02 /
JIA, Yanqiu 6 Xinghai Street, Suzhou Industrial Park Suzhou, Jiangsu 215155 / CN | 03 /
JIN, Dan 6 Xinghai Street, Suzhou Industrial Park Suzhou, Jiangsu 215155 / CN | [2022/19] | Representative(s) | Arnold & Siedsma Bezuidenhoutseweg 57 2594 AC The Hague / NL | [2022/19] | Application number, filing date | 19937036.2 | 11.07.2019 | [2022/20] | WO2019CN95597 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021003736 | Date: | 14.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3997726 | Date: | 18.05.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.01.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 14.01.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.03.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H01H85/20, H01H85/02, H05K5/00, H01H85/00, // B60R16/023 | [2023/14] | CPC: |
H01H85/0021 (EP,KR,US);
H01H85/0241 (US);
H01H85/2045 (EP);
H01H85/54 (KR,US);
B60R16/0238 (EP);
H01H2085/0275 (EP,KR,US);
H01H2085/208 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/19] | H01H85/20, H01H85/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/19] | Title | German: | SCHMELZSICHERUNGSVORRICHTUNG MIT INTEGRIERTEN SOLENOIDEN | [2022/19] | English: | FUSE APPARATUS WITH INTEGRATED SOLENOIDS | [2022/19] | French: | APPAREIL À FUSIBLE À SOLÉNOÏDES INTÉGRÉS | [2022/19] | Entry into regional phase | 07.02.2022 | National basic fee paid | 07.02.2022 | Search fee paid | 07.02.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.02.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.02.2022 | Examination requested [2022/20] | 18.09.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.09.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAYI]US2013343030 (HATTORI YUUICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,7,13 * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0064] * [A] 8,10-12 [Y] 3-5 [I] 6,9,14,15; | [Y]CN205149739U (SHANGHAI AIERSHENG ELECTRIC CO LTD) [Y] 3-5,14,15* Machine translation;; figure 1 *; | [XAY]CN106061145B (ZHUHAI ENPOWER ELEC CO LTD) [X] 1,13 * Machine translation;; figures 1-7 * [A] 2-12 [Y] 14,15 | International search | [A]KR20140080121 (KOREA ELECTRIC TERMINAL CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-20* the whole document *; | [X]CN203707065U (NINGBO XINGFENG MACHINERY CO LTD) [X] 1-20 * description, paragraphs [0017]-[0021] and figure 1 *; | [A]CN104299867 (DELPHI TECH INC) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [A]US2015165992 (SCHEELE JUERGEN [DE], et al) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [A]CN208622671U (ANBOFU CENTRAL ELECTRIC SHANGHAI CO LTD) [A] 1-20 * the whole document * | by applicant | US2013343030 | CN205149739U |