EP4002817 - TERMINAL SET AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.07.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.04.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu SEOUL 07336 / KR | [2022/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PARK, Joo Hyun IP Center, LG Electronics Inc., 19, Yangjae-daero 11-gil, Seocho-gu Seoul 06772 / KR | 02 /
LEE, Tae Sung IP Center, LG Electronics Inc., 19, Yangjae-daero 11-gil, Seocho-gu Seoul 06772 / KR | [2022/21] | Representative(s) | Schornack, Oliver Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/21] | Schornack, Oliver Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19937655.9 | 18.07.2019 | [2022/21] | WO2019KR08855 | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021010525 | Date: | 21.01.2021 | Language: | KO | [2021/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4002817 | Date: | 25.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 21.01.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.03.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/14, H04M1/02, H04M1/72409, H04M1/18, H04M1/72454 | [2023/16] | CPC: |
H04M1/72454 (EP,US);
H04M1/725 (KR);
G06F1/1647 (US);
G06F3/1423 (EP,KR);
G06F3/1446 (EP);
G06F3/147 (KR);
H04M1/0266 (KR,US);
H04M1/724092 (EP,US);
G06F2200/1614 (US);
G09G2340/0492 (EP);
H04M1/0214 (EP);
H04M1/185 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2022/21] | H04M1/725 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/21] | Title | German: | ENDGERÄTESET UND VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN STEUERUNG | [2022/21] | English: | TERMINAL SET AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING SAME | [2022/21] | French: | ENSEMBLE DE TERMINAUX ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE | [2022/21] | Entry into regional phase | 12.01.2022 | Translation filed | 12.01.2022 | National basic fee paid | 12.01.2022 | Search fee paid | 12.01.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.01.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.01.2022 | Examination requested [2022/21] | 21.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.06.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.07.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2010321275 (HINCKLEY KENNETH PAUL [US], et al); | [X]US2019163432 (FILES JACE W [US], et al) | International search | [A]KR20090125544 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 1-10 * See paragraphs [0053]-[0088]; and figures 4-13. *; | [A]US2015116362 (AURONGZEB DEEDER M [US], et al) [A] 1-10* See paragraphs [0058]-[0121]; and figures 3-15. *; | [A]KR20150094788 (EMPIRE TECHNOLOGY DEV LLC [US]) [A] 1-10 * See paragraphs [0018]-[0022]; claims 1-25; and figures 5-6. *; | [A]KR20180097693 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [A] 1-10 * See paragraphs [0048]-[0131]; and figures 8a-13. *; | [A]KR101984683B (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD.) [A] 1-10 * See paragraphs [0032]-[0184]; claims 1 and 13; and figures 1-27. * |