EP3845471 - DISCHARGING MECHANISM, MATERIAL STORING DEVICE, AND SELF-SERVICE VENDING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2021/27] | MATERIAL DROPPING MECHANISM, MATERIAL STORAGE DEVICE, AND VENDING MACHINE | ||
[2022/36] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.08.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.09.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.07.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.06.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cino Technology (Shenzhen) Limited 401, G Building Licheng Scientific and Technological Industrial Park, Shajing, Baoan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518104 / CN | [2021/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LONG, Qiyi 401, G Building Licheng Scientific and Technological Industrial Park Shajing, Baoan Shenzhen Guangdong 518104 / CN | 02 /
AN, Lishuang 401, G Building Licheng Scientific and Technological Industrial Park Shajing, Baoan Shenzhen Guangdong 518104 / CN | 03 /
LONG, Qiren 401, G Building Licheng Scientific and Technological Industrial Park Shajing, Baoan Shenzhen Guangdong 518104 / CN | [2021/27] | Representative(s) | Petculescu, Ana-Maria Bayramoglu Law Offices LLC Türkiye Irtibat Ofisi, Mira Office, Kanuni Sultan Süleyman Boulevard, 5387. street Beytepe, floor 12, no:50 06800 Cankaya, Ankara / TR | [2021/27] | Application number, filing date | 19938500.6 | 31.12.2019 | [2021/27] | WO2019CN130798 | Priority number, date | CN201910666013 | 23.07.2019 Original published format: CN201910666013 | [2021/27] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021012626 | Date: | 28.01.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3845471 | Date: | 07.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3845471 | Date: | 12.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 28.01.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B65D83/00, G07F13/06, B65G59/06 | [2021/47] | CPC: |
G07F13/065 (EP,CN);
B65D83/00 (CN);
B65G59/062 (EP);
G07F11/44 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2021/27] | B65D83/00, G07F13/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/27] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MATERIALABFALLMECHANISMUS, MATERIALSPEICHERVORRICHTUNG, UND SELBSTBEDIENUNGSVERKAUFSAUTOMAT | [2022/36] | English: | DISCHARGING MECHANISM, MATERIAL STORING DEVICE, AND SELF-SERVICE VENDING MACHINE | [2022/36] | French: | MÉCANISME DE DÉCHARGEMENT DE MATÉRIAU, DISPOSITIF DE STOCKAGE DE MATÉRIAU, ET DISTRIBUTEUR AUTOMATIQUE EN LIBRE-SERVICE | [2022/36] |
Former [2021/27] | MATERIALABFALLMECHANISMUS, MATERIALSPEICHERVORRICHTUNG UND VERKAUFSAUTOMAT | ||
Former [2021/27] | MATERIAL DROPPING MECHANISM, MATERIAL STORAGE DEVICE, AND VENDING MACHINE | ||
Former [2021/27] | MÉCANISME DE CHUTE DE MATÉRIAU, DISPOSITIF DE STOCKAGE DE MATÉRIAU ET DISTRIBUTEUR AUTOMATIQUE | Entry into regional phase | 01.04.2021 | Translation filed | 01.04.2021 | National basic fee paid | 01.04.2021 | Search fee paid | 01.04.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.04.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/27] | 27.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.07.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.08.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 30.08.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.08.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 13.07.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 31.12.2019 | AL | 12.10.2022 | AT | 12.10.2022 | BG | 12.10.2022 | CY | 12.10.2022 | CZ | 12.10.2022 | DK | 12.10.2022 | EE | 12.10.2022 | ES | 12.10.2022 | FI | 12.10.2022 | HR | 12.10.2022 | IT | 12.10.2022 | LT | 12.10.2022 | LV | 12.10.2022 | MC | 12.10.2022 | MK | 12.10.2022 | MT | 12.10.2022 | NL | 12.10.2022 | PL | 12.10.2022 | RO | 12.10.2022 | RS | 12.10.2022 | SE | 12.10.2022 | SI | 12.10.2022 | SK | 12.10.2022 | SM | 12.10.2022 | TR | 12.10.2022 | BE | 31.12.2022 | IE | 31.12.2022 | LU | 31.12.2022 | NO | 12.01.2023 | GR | 13.01.2023 | IS | 12.02.2023 | PT | 13.02.2023 | DE | 01.07.2023 | [2024/44] |
Former [2024/34] | HU | 31.12.2019 | |
AL | 12.10.2022 | ||
AT | 12.10.2022 | ||
BG | 12.10.2022 | ||
CY | 12.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2022 | ||
DK | 12.10.2022 | ||
EE | 12.10.2022 | ||
ES | 12.10.2022 | ||
FI | 12.10.2022 | ||
HR | 12.10.2022 | ||
IT | 12.10.2022 | ||
LT | 12.10.2022 | ||
LV | 12.10.2022 | ||
MC | 12.10.2022 | ||
MK | 12.10.2022 | ||
NL | 12.10.2022 | ||
PL | 12.10.2022 | ||
RO | 12.10.2022 | ||
RS | 12.10.2022 | ||
SE | 12.10.2022 | ||
SI | 12.10.2022 | ||
SK | 12.10.2022 | ||
SM | 12.10.2022 | ||
TR | 12.10.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
IE | 31.12.2022 | ||
LU | 31.12.2022 | ||
NO | 12.01.2023 | ||
GR | 13.01.2023 | ||
IS | 12.02.2023 | ||
PT | 13.02.2023 | ||
DE | 01.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/29] | HU | 31.12.2019 | |
AL | 12.10.2022 | ||
AT | 12.10.2022 | ||
CY | 12.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2022 | ||
DK | 12.10.2022 | ||
EE | 12.10.2022 | ||
ES | 12.10.2022 | ||
FI | 12.10.2022 | ||
HR | 12.10.2022 | ||
IT | 12.10.2022 | ||
LT | 12.10.2022 | ||
LV | 12.10.2022 | ||
MC | 12.10.2022 | ||
MK | 12.10.2022 | ||
NL | 12.10.2022 | ||
PL | 12.10.2022 | ||
RO | 12.10.2022 | ||
RS | 12.10.2022 | ||
SE | 12.10.2022 | ||
SI | 12.10.2022 | ||
SK | 12.10.2022 | ||
SM | 12.10.2022 | ||
TR | 12.10.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
IE | 31.12.2022 | ||
LU | 31.12.2022 | ||
NO | 12.01.2023 | ||
GR | 13.01.2023 | ||
IS | 12.02.2023 | ||
PT | 13.02.2023 | ||
DE | 01.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/27] | HU | 31.12.2019 | |
AL | 12.10.2022 | ||
AT | 12.10.2022 | ||
CY | 12.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2022 | ||
DK | 12.10.2022 | ||
EE | 12.10.2022 | ||
ES | 12.10.2022 | ||
FI | 12.10.2022 | ||
HR | 12.10.2022 | ||
IT | 12.10.2022 | ||
LT | 12.10.2022 | ||
LV | 12.10.2022 | ||
MK | 12.10.2022 | ||
NL | 12.10.2022 | ||
PL | 12.10.2022 | ||
RO | 12.10.2022 | ||
RS | 12.10.2022 | ||
SE | 12.10.2022 | ||
SI | 12.10.2022 | ||
SK | 12.10.2022 | ||
SM | 12.10.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
IE | 31.12.2022 | ||
LU | 31.12.2022 | ||
NO | 12.01.2023 | ||
GR | 13.01.2023 | ||
IS | 12.02.2023 | ||
PT | 13.02.2023 | ||
DE | 01.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/26] | HU | 31.12.2019 | |
AL | 12.10.2022 | ||
AT | 12.10.2022 | ||
CY | 12.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2022 | ||
DK | 12.10.2022 | ||
EE | 12.10.2022 | ||
ES | 12.10.2022 | ||
FI | 12.10.2022 | ||
HR | 12.10.2022 | ||
IT | 12.10.2022 | ||
LT | 12.10.2022 | ||
LV | 12.10.2022 | ||
NL | 12.10.2022 | ||
PL | 12.10.2022 | ||
RO | 12.10.2022 | ||
RS | 12.10.2022 | ||
SE | 12.10.2022 | ||
SI | 12.10.2022 | ||
SK | 12.10.2022 | ||
SM | 12.10.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
IE | 31.12.2022 | ||
LU | 31.12.2022 | ||
NO | 12.01.2023 | ||
GR | 13.01.2023 | ||
IS | 12.02.2023 | ||
PT | 13.02.2023 | ||
DE | 01.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/25] | HU | 31.12.2019 | |
AL | 12.10.2022 | ||
AT | 12.10.2022 | ||
CY | 12.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2022 | ||
DK | 12.10.2022 | ||
EE | 12.10.2022 | ||
ES | 12.10.2022 | ||
FI | 12.10.2022 | ||
HR | 12.10.2022 | ||
LT | 12.10.2022 | ||
LV | 12.10.2022 | ||
NL | 12.10.2022 | ||
PL | 12.10.2022 | ||
RO | 12.10.2022 | ||
RS | 12.10.2022 | ||
SE | 12.10.2022 | ||
SI | 12.10.2022 | ||
SK | 12.10.2022 | ||
SM | 12.10.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
IE | 31.12.2022 | ||
LU | 31.12.2022 | ||
NO | 12.01.2023 | ||
GR | 13.01.2023 | ||
IS | 12.02.2023 | ||
PT | 13.02.2023 | ||
DE | 01.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/21] | AL | 12.10.2022 | |
AT | 12.10.2022 | ||
CY | 12.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2022 | ||
DK | 12.10.2022 | ||
EE | 12.10.2022 | ||
ES | 12.10.2022 | ||
FI | 12.10.2022 | ||
HR | 12.10.2022 | ||
LT | 12.10.2022 | ||
LV | 12.10.2022 | ||
NL | 12.10.2022 | ||
PL | 12.10.2022 | ||
RO | 12.10.2022 | ||
RS | 12.10.2022 | ||
SE | 12.10.2022 | ||
SI | 12.10.2022 | ||
SK | 12.10.2022 | ||
SM | 12.10.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
IE | 31.12.2022 | ||
LU | 31.12.2022 | ||
NO | 12.01.2023 | ||
GR | 13.01.2023 | ||
IS | 12.02.2023 | ||
PT | 13.02.2023 | ||
DE | 01.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 12.10.2022 | |
AT | 12.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2022 | ||
DK | 12.10.2022 | ||
EE | 12.10.2022 | ||
ES | 12.10.2022 | ||
FI | 12.10.2022 | ||
HR | 12.10.2022 | ||
LT | 12.10.2022 | ||
LV | 12.10.2022 | ||
NL | 12.10.2022 | ||
PL | 12.10.2022 | ||
RO | 12.10.2022 | ||
RS | 12.10.2022 | ||
SE | 12.10.2022 | ||
SI | 12.10.2022 | ||
SK | 12.10.2022 | ||
SM | 12.10.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
IE | 31.12.2022 | ||
LU | 31.12.2022 | ||
NO | 12.01.2023 | ||
GR | 13.01.2023 | ||
IS | 12.02.2023 | ||
PT | 13.02.2023 | ||
DE | 01.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AL | 12.10.2022 | |
AT | 12.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2022 | ||
DK | 12.10.2022 | ||
EE | 12.10.2022 | ||
ES | 12.10.2022 | ||
FI | 12.10.2022 | ||
HR | 12.10.2022 | ||
LT | 12.10.2022 | ||
LV | 12.10.2022 | ||
NL | 12.10.2022 | ||
PL | 12.10.2022 | ||
RO | 12.10.2022 | ||
RS | 12.10.2022 | ||
SE | 12.10.2022 | ||
SK | 12.10.2022 | ||
SM | 12.10.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
IE | 31.12.2022 | ||
LU | 31.12.2022 | ||
NO | 12.01.2023 | ||
GR | 13.01.2023 | ||
IS | 12.02.2023 | ||
PT | 13.02.2023 | ||
DE | 01.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AL | 12.10.2022 | |
AT | 12.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2022 | ||
DK | 12.10.2022 | ||
EE | 12.10.2022 | ||
ES | 12.10.2022 | ||
FI | 12.10.2022 | ||
HR | 12.10.2022 | ||
LT | 12.10.2022 | ||
LV | 12.10.2022 | ||
NL | 12.10.2022 | ||
PL | 12.10.2022 | ||
RO | 12.10.2022 | ||
RS | 12.10.2022 | ||
SE | 12.10.2022 | ||
SK | 12.10.2022 | ||
SM | 12.10.2022 | ||
IE | 31.12.2022 | ||
LU | 31.12.2022 | ||
NO | 12.01.2023 | ||
GR | 13.01.2023 | ||
IS | 12.02.2023 | ||
PT | 13.02.2023 | ||
DE | 01.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 12.10.2022 | |
AT | 12.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2022 | ||
DK | 12.10.2022 | ||
EE | 12.10.2022 | ||
ES | 12.10.2022 | ||
FI | 12.10.2022 | ||
HR | 12.10.2022 | ||
LT | 12.10.2022 | ||
LV | 12.10.2022 | ||
NL | 12.10.2022 | ||
PL | 12.10.2022 | ||
RO | 12.10.2022 | ||
RS | 12.10.2022 | ||
SE | 12.10.2022 | ||
SK | 12.10.2022 | ||
SM | 12.10.2022 | ||
LU | 31.12.2022 | ||
NO | 12.01.2023 | ||
GR | 13.01.2023 | ||
IS | 12.02.2023 | ||
PT | 13.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 12.10.2022 | |
AT | 12.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2022 | ||
DK | 12.10.2022 | ||
EE | 12.10.2022 | ||
ES | 12.10.2022 | ||
FI | 12.10.2022 | ||
HR | 12.10.2022 | ||
LT | 12.10.2022 | ||
LV | 12.10.2022 | ||
NL | 12.10.2022 | ||
PL | 12.10.2022 | ||
RO | 12.10.2022 | ||
RS | 12.10.2022 | ||
SE | 12.10.2022 | ||
SM | 12.10.2022 | ||
NO | 12.01.2023 | ||
GR | 13.01.2023 | ||
IS | 12.02.2023 | ||
PT | 13.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 12.10.2022 | |
CZ | 12.10.2022 | ||
DK | 12.10.2022 | ||
EE | 12.10.2022 | ||
ES | 12.10.2022 | ||
FI | 12.10.2022 | ||
HR | 12.10.2022 | ||
LT | 12.10.2022 | ||
LV | 12.10.2022 | ||
NL | 12.10.2022 | ||
PL | 12.10.2022 | ||
RO | 12.10.2022 | ||
RS | 12.10.2022 | ||
SE | 12.10.2022 | ||
SM | 12.10.2022 | ||
NO | 12.01.2023 | ||
GR | 13.01.2023 | ||
IS | 12.02.2023 | ||
PT | 13.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | AT | 12.10.2022 | |
DK | 12.10.2022 | ||
EE | 12.10.2022 | ||
ES | 12.10.2022 | ||
FI | 12.10.2022 | ||
HR | 12.10.2022 | ||
LT | 12.10.2022 | ||
LV | 12.10.2022 | ||
NL | 12.10.2022 | ||
PL | 12.10.2022 | ||
RS | 12.10.2022 | ||
SE | 12.10.2022 | ||
SM | 12.10.2022 | ||
NO | 12.01.2023 | ||
GR | 13.01.2023 | ||
IS | 12.02.2023 | ||
PT | 13.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AT | 12.10.2022 | |
DK | 12.10.2022 | ||
ES | 12.10.2022 | ||
FI | 12.10.2022 | ||
HR | 12.10.2022 | ||
LT | 12.10.2022 | ||
LV | 12.10.2022 | ||
NL | 12.10.2022 | ||
PL | 12.10.2022 | ||
RS | 12.10.2022 | ||
SE | 12.10.2022 | ||
SM | 12.10.2022 | ||
NO | 12.01.2023 | ||
GR | 13.01.2023 | ||
IS | 12.02.2023 | ||
PT | 13.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AT | 12.10.2022 | |
ES | 12.10.2022 | ||
FI | 12.10.2022 | ||
HR | 12.10.2022 | ||
LT | 12.10.2022 | ||
LV | 12.10.2022 | ||
NL | 12.10.2022 | ||
PL | 12.10.2022 | ||
RS | 12.10.2022 | ||
SE | 12.10.2022 | ||
NO | 12.01.2023 | ||
GR | 13.01.2023 | ||
IS | 12.02.2023 | ||
PT | 13.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 12.10.2022 | |
ES | 12.10.2022 | ||
FI | 12.10.2022 | ||
LT | 12.10.2022 | ||
LV | 12.10.2022 | ||
NL | 12.10.2022 | ||
SE | 12.10.2022 | ||
NO | 12.01.2023 | ||
GR | 13.01.2023 | ||
PT | 13.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 12.10.2022 | |
ES | 12.10.2022 | ||
FI | 12.10.2022 | ||
LT | 12.10.2022 | ||
NL | 12.10.2022 | ||
SE | 12.10.2022 | ||
NO | 12.01.2023 | ||
PT | 13.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 12.10.2022 | |
NL | 12.10.2022 | ||
NO | 12.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/17] | NL | 12.10.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US1742371 (SIMMONS PAUL R) [X] 1,2,5-11 * claim 1 * * figures 1-12 * * page 1, line 1 - page 2, line 125 * [Y] 3,4; | [A]US3071292 (ATWOOD SETH G, et al) [A] 1-11* figure 1 *; | [Y]DE3239315 (BLANC GMBH & CO [DE]) [Y] 3,4 * figure 1 *; | [XY]JP2012230552 (TACT:KK) [X] 1,2,5-11 * claim 1 * * figures 1-10 * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0065] * [Y] 3,4 | Examination | US2000008 | JPS5241700U |