EP4016888 - HARQ FEEDBACK METHOD AND APPARATUS, AND READABLE STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.05.2022 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.02.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Beijing Xiaomi Mobile Software Co., Ltd. No. 018, Floor 8, Building 6, Yard 33 Middle Xierqi Road Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | [2022/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MU, Qin No.018, Floor 8, Building 6, Yard 33, Middle Xierqi Road, Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | [2022/25] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [2022/25] | Application number, filing date | 19941188.5 | 13.08.2019 | [2022/25] | WO2019CN100456 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021026787 | Date: | 18.02.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4016888 | Date: | 22.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 18.02.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04L1/16, H04L1/18, H04W74/00, H04W74/08, H04L5/00 | [2022/34] | CPC: |
H04L1/1864 (EP,US);
H04W74/002 (CN,KR);
H04L1/1607 (CN,KR);
H04L1/1854 (EP,US);
H04L1/1812 (CN,KR,US);
H04L1/1861 (US);
H04L1/1896 (EP,KR);
H04L5/0055 (EP);
H04W72/21 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2022/25] | H04L1/16, H04L1/18, H04W74/00, H04W74/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/25] | Title | German: | HARQ-FEEDBACK-VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG SOWIE LESBARES SPEICHERMEDIUM | [2022/25] | English: | HARQ FEEDBACK METHOD AND APPARATUS, AND READABLE STORAGE MEDIUM | [2022/25] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE RÉTROACTION HARQ ET SUPPORT DE STOCKAGE LISIBLE | [2022/25] | Entry into regional phase | 09.03.2022 | Translation filed | 09.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 09.03.2022 | Search fee paid | 09.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/25] | 15.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.02.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]WO2020149660 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]); | [E]WO2020168103 (IDAC HOLDINGS INC [US]); |