EP4016949 - COMMUNICATION METHOD AND DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.05.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.02.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2022/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GUO, Longhua Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
HU, Li Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
LI, He Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2022/25] | Representative(s) | Körber, Martin Hans Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Karlstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/25] | Körber, Martin Hans Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstraße 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19941841.9 | 18.08.2019 | [2022/25] | WO2019CN101250 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021031055 | Date: | 25.02.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4016949 | Date: | 22.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 25.02.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04W12/033, H04W12/106, H04L9/40 | [2022/32] | CPC: |
H04W12/033 (EP,US);
H04W76/12 (EP,US);
H04L9/14 (EP);
H04L9/3242 (EP);
H04W12/106 (EP,US);
H04L63/0272 (EP);
H04W88/14 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/25] | H04L29/06, H04L9/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/25] | Title | German: | KOMMUNIKATIONSVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG | [2022/25] | English: | COMMUNICATION METHOD AND DEVICE | [2022/25] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE COMMUNICATION | [2022/25] | Entry into regional phase | 17.03.2022 | Translation filed | 17.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 17.03.2022 | Search fee paid | 17.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/25] | 10.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.02.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2011305339 (NORRMAN KARL [SE], et al) [X] 1,2,9,10,15 * paragraphs [0026] , [0 46] , [0 53] , [0 61] * [I] 3-8,11-14; | [XI]EP2485561 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [X] 1,2,9,10,15 * paragraphs [0037] , [0038] , [0042] , [0046] , [0049] * [I] 3-8,11-14; | [A]WO2019062920 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [A] 1-15* paragraphs [0008] - [0036] * |