EP3985148 - GROWTH METHOD AND EQUIPMENT FOR SCINTILLATION CRYSTAL WITH SHORTENED DECAY TIME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.11.2023 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.03.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.02.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.02.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MEISHAN BOYA ADVANCED MATERIALS CO., LTD. No. 3, Junle Road Jinxiang Chemical Industrial Park Dongpo District Meishan, Sichuan 620010 / CN | [2022/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Yu 3, Junle Road, Jinxiang Chemical Industrial Park Dongpo District, Meishan Sichuan 620010 / CN | 02 /
GUAN, Weiming 3, Junle Road, Jinxiang Chemical Industrial Park Dongpo District, Meishan Sichuan 620010 / CN | 03 /
LI, Min 3, Junle Road, Jinxiang Chemical Industrial Park Dongpo District, Meishan Sichuan 620010 / CN | [2022/16] | Representative(s) | Wang, Bo Panovision IP Ebersberger Straße 3 85570 Markt Schwaben / DE | [2022/16] | Application number, filing date | 19942078.7 | 21.08.2019 | [2022/16] | WO2019CN101725 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021031145 | Date: | 25.02.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3985148 | Date: | 20.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 25.02.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C09K11/77, C30B29/22, C30B15/00 | [2022/28] | CPC: |
C09K11/77742 (EP);
C09K11/7774 (EP,CN,US);
C30B15/00 (EP);
C30B15/02 (US);
C30B15/20 (CN);
C30B29/22 (EP,CN,US);
G21K4/00 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/16] | C30B29/34, C30B15/36 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/16] | Title | German: | WACHSTUMSVERFAHREN UND -AUSRÜSTUNG FÜR SZINTILLATIONSKRISTALLE MIT VERKÜRZTER ABKLINGZEIT | [2022/16] | English: | GROWTH METHOD AND EQUIPMENT FOR SCINTILLATION CRYSTAL WITH SHORTENED DECAY TIME | [2022/16] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET ÉQUIPEMENT DE CROISSANCE POUR CRISTAL SCINTILLATEUR À TEMPS DE DÉCLIN RACCOURCI | [2022/16] | Entry into regional phase | 13.01.2022 | Translation filed | 13.01.2022 | National basic fee paid | 13.01.2022 | Search fee paid | 13.01.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.01.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.01.2022 | Examination requested [2022/16] | 12.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.11.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.02.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2006266277 (USUI TATSUYA [JP], et al) [X] 1,2 * examples 1,8; claim -; table 2 * [I] 3-15; | [XI]US2014291580 (ZAGUMENNYI ALEXANDER IOSIFOVICH [RU], et al) [X] 1-6,8-10 * paragraphs [0038] , [0067] , [0241] , [0242]; example 12 * [I] 13-15; | [A]JP2016204181 (SUMITOMO METAL MINING CO) [A] 14,15* the whole document *; | [XI] - ZAGUMENNYI A I ET AL, "Czochralski growth and characterization of (Lu1-xGdx)2SiO5 single crystals for scintillators", JOURNAL OF CRYSTAL GROWTH, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (19970402), vol. 174, no. 1-4, doi:10.1016/S0022-0248(96)01171-2, ISSN 0022-0248, pages 331 - 336, XP004113852 [X] 1-4,6-12 * Experimental techniques; page 332 * * tables 2,4 * [I] 5,13-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0022-0248(96)01171-2 |