EP4022127 - THROUGH-AIR DRYING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.06.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kimberly-Clark Worldwide, Inc. 2300 Winchester Road Neenah, Wisconsin 54956 / US | [2022/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SEYMOUR, Robert J. 2413 W Twin Willows Drive Appleton, Wisconsin 54914 / US | 02 /
RAMAZANI-REND, Reza Kimberly-Clark Worldwide, Inc. 2300 Winchester Road Neenah, Wisconsin 54956 / US | 03 /
LAWSON, Daniel K. Kimberly-Clark Owensboro Mill 601 Innovative Way Owensboro, Kentucky 42301 / US | 04 /
ZWICK, Kenneth J. Kimberly-Clark Worldwide, Inc. 2300 Winchester Road Neenah, Wisconsin 54956 / US | 05 /
ALLEN, Peter J. 409 Park Drive Neenah, Wisconsin 54956 / US | 06 /
HAIDUK, Nathan J. Kimberly-Clark Worldwide, Inc. 2300 Winchester Road Neenah, Wisconsin 54956 / US | 07 /
KRAUTKRAMER, Robert E. Kimberly-Clark Worldwide, Inc. 2300 Winchester Road Neenah, Wisconsin 54956 / US | [2022/27] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2022/27] | Application number, filing date | 19943028.1 | 29.08.2019 | [2022/27] | WO2019US48685 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021040709 | Date: | 04.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4022127 | Date: | 06.07.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.03.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SG | 04.03.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.05.2023 | Classification | IPC: | D21F5/00, F26B13/16, F26B13/24 | [2022/27] | CPC: |
D21F5/182 (EP,KR,US);
F26B13/16 (EP,KR,US);
F26B13/24 (KR,US);
F26B3/06 (EP,KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/27] | Title | German: | DURCHLUFT-TROCKNUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2022/27] | English: | THROUGH-AIR DRYING APPARATUS | [2022/27] | French: | APPAREIL DE SÉCHAGE À AIR TRAVERSANT | [2022/27] | Entry into regional phase | 10.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 10.03.2022 | Search fee paid | 10.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/27] | 11.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.12.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]GB773908 (BORJE VALENTIN LECKNER) [A] 1-30 * page 1 line 85-95, page 2 line 3-46, page 3 line 9-20, 60-79, figures 1, 2, 6-8 *; | [A]US3432936 (COLE RICHARD I, et al) [A] 0 * entire document, in particular, column 14 line 8-23, figure 3 *; | [A]US3771236 (CANDOR R, et al) [A] 0 * entire document, in particular, column 8 line 63-column 9 line 43, figures 8-9 *; | [A]US4974340 (WEDEL GREGORY L [US], et al) [A] 0* entire document, in particular, column 4 line 59-column 5 line 20, figures 2-3 *; | [A]US6199296 (JEWITT DENNIS E [GB]) [A] 0 * entire document, in particular, column 6 line 5-column 8 line 45, figures 1-3 * | by applicant | GB773908 | US3432936 | US3771236 | US4974340 | US6199296 |