EP4023088 - PROGRAM, METHOD, AND SYSTEM FOR CHECKING SUCTION METHOD OF FLAVOR SUCTION INSTRUMENT, ETC [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.06.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Japan Tobacco Inc. 1-1, Toranomon 4-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-6927 / JP | [2022/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HASHIMOTO, Kentaro c/o Japan Tobacco Inc., 17-7, Yokokawa 1-chome, Sumida-ku Tokyo 130-8603 / JP | [2022/27] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2022/27] | Application number, filing date | 19943619.7 | 29.08.2019 | [2022/27] | WO2019JP33883 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021038784 | Date: | 04.03.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4023088 | Date: | 06.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.03.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.05.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A24F40/53, A24F40/60, G09G5/02, // A24F40/51 | [2023/24] | CPC: |
A24F40/53 (EP);
A24F40/60 (EP);
G09G5/026 (EP);
A24F40/51 (EP);
G09G2354/00 (EP);
G09G2370/022 (EP);
G09G2380/06 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/27] | A24F47/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/27] | Title | German: | PROGRAMM, VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUM ÜBERPRÜFEN DES SAUGVERFAHRENS EINES GESCHMACKSAUGINSTRUMENTS USW. | [2022/27] | English: | PROGRAM, METHOD, AND SYSTEM FOR CHECKING SUCTION METHOD OF FLAVOR SUCTION INSTRUMENT, ETC | [2022/27] | French: | PROGRAMME, PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME POUR VÉRIFIER UN PROCÉDÉ D'ASPIRATION D'UN INSTRUMENT D'ASPIRATION D'ARÔME, ETC | [2022/27] | Entry into regional phase | 23.03.2022 | Translation filed | 23.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 23.03.2022 | Search fee paid | 23.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/27] | 30.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.11.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2018207887 (JAPAN TOBACCO INC [JP]); | US2019373958 [ ] (WATANABE TOMOICHI [JP], et al) | International search | [Y]JP2007328394 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [A]JP2011518638 ; | [A]JP2016521356 ; | [A]US2016255878 (HUANG LIJI [US], et al); | [A]JP2019508026 ; | [XYA]JP2019518441 | by applicant | WO2017012459 |