EP4007991 - GATING OF MEDICAL IMAGING DATA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.05.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Medical Solutions USA, Inc. 40 Liberty Blvd. Malvern, PA 19355 / US | [2022/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAHIL, Amos 11 Night Heron Drive Stony Brook, New York 11790 / US | [2022/23] | Representative(s) | Horn Kleimann Waitzhofer Schmid-Dreyer Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Theresienhöhe 12 80339 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/23] | Horn Kleimann Waitzhofer Patentanwälte PartG mbB Ganghoferstraße 29a 80339 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19944021.5 | 05.09.2019 | [2022/23] | WO2019US49681 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021045760 | Date: | 11.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4007991 | Date: | 08.06.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.03.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 11.03.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.04.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G06T11/00, A61B5/0205, A61B6/00, A61B6/03, G06T7/20, A61B5/00, A61B5/024, A61B5/08, A61B5/113 | [2023/19] | CPC: |
A61B6/037 (EP,IL);
A61B5/7289 (EP,IL,US);
A61B5/0033 (EP,IL);
A61B5/024 (EP,IL);
A61B5/0816 (EP,IL);
A61B5/113 (EP,IL);
A61B5/33 (EP,IL);
A61B5/721 (EP,IL);
A61B5/7282 (US);
A61B5/7292 (EP,IL);
A61B6/527 (EP,IL);
A61B6/5288 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2022/23] | G06T11/00, A61B5/0205, A61B6/00, A61B6/03, G06T7/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/23] | Title | German: | GATING MEDIZINISCHER BILDGEBUNGSDATEN | [2022/23] | English: | GATING OF MEDICAL IMAGING DATA | [2022/23] | French: | DÉCLENCHEMENT DE DONNÉES D'IMAGERIE MÉDICALE | [2022/23] | Entry into regional phase | 02.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 02.03.2022 | Search fee paid | 02.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/23] | 02.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.11.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US2004077941 (REDDY SHANKARA BONTHU [US], et al); | International search | [X]US2004077941 (REDDY SHANKARA BONTHU [US], et al); | [A]US2005096543 (JACKSON JOHN I [US], et al); | [A]US2005203395 (SUI LEI [US], et al); | [A]US2008300486 (TIRUMALAI ARUN [US], et al); | [A]US2016015352 (BROWN BRIAN [US], et al); | [A]US2017039738 (ZIV OMER [IL], et al) | by applicant | US2004077941 | US2005096543 | US2005203395 | US2008300486 | US2016015352 | US2017039738 |