EP4017349 - THERAPEUTIC APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.05.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shanghai United Imaging Healthcare Co., Ltd. IP Dept. HQ No.2258 Chengbei Rd. Jiading Industrial District Shanghai 201807 / CN | [2022/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YU, Xing'en No. 2258 Chengbei Road Jiading District Shanghai 201807 / CN | 02 /
NI, Cheng No. 2258 Chengbei Road, Jiading District Shanghai 201807 / CN | 03 /
WANG, Peng No. 2258 Chengbei Road, Jiading District Shanghai 201807 / CN | [2022/26] | Representative(s) | Wang, Bo Panovision IP Ebersberger Straße 3 85570 Markt Schwaben / DE | [2022/26] | Application number, filing date | 19945076.8 | 09.09.2019 | [2022/26] | WO2019CN104884 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021046675 | Date: | 18.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4017349 | Date: | 29.06.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.03.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 18.03.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61N5/10, G01R33/48, A61B5/055, G01R33/3815 | [2022/38] | CPC: |
A61N5/1049 (EP,US);
G01R33/3804 (US);
A61B5/0036 (US);
A61N5/1045 (US);
A61N5/107 (US);
G01R33/381 (EP);
G01R33/3815 (EP,US);
G01R33/4808 (EP);
G01R33/4812 (EP,US);
A61N2005/1055 (EP,US);
A61N2005/1089 (US);
A61N2005/109 (US);
A61N2005/1094 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/26] | A61B5/055, A61N5/10, G01R33/48 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/26] | Title | German: | THERAPEUTISCHE VORRICHTUNG | [2022/26] | English: | THERAPEUTIC APPARATUS | [2022/26] | French: | APPAREIL THÉRAPEUTIQUE | [2022/26] | Entry into regional phase | 22.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 22.03.2022 | Search fee paid | 22.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/26] | 20.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.03.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2011304416 (WARNER RORY JOHN [GB], et al) [X] 9-13 * paragraphs [0012] - [0025] - [0 34] - [0040] * * figures 1, 3 * [I] 14; | [XI]US2014107468 (CALVERT SIMON JAMES [GB]) [X] 9-13 * paragraphs [0007] , [00 8] , [0 17] - [0021] * * figure - * [I] 14; | [XI]US2016136456 (JONAS PHILIP ALEXANDER [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7-13,15 * paragraphs [0010] - [0018] - [0 37] - [0043] - [0 50] , [0 51] * * figures 1, 2, 4 * [I] 6,14; | [A]US2019101243 (ZOU LIJUN [CN], et al) [A] 6,14* paragraph [0023] * |