EP4000172 - POWER CONVERTER HAVING CAPACITORS FOR DATA TRANSMISSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.04.2022 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tridonic GmbH & Co KG Färbergasse 15 6851 Dornbirn / AT | [2022/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZOU, Zhihong 1F, Building 2, 1970 Science Park Minxing Industrial Zone Minkang Road, Minzhi Street Longhua District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518131 / CN | 02 /
YAN, Jialiang 1F, Building 2, 1970 Science Park Minxing Industrial Zone Minkang Road, Minzhi Street Longhua District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518131 / CN | 03 /
WANG, Shuanghong 1F, Building 2, 1970 Science Park Minxing Industrial Zone Minkang Road, Minzhi Street Longhua District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518131 / CN | [2022/21] | Representative(s) | Rupp, Christian, et al Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Karlstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/21] | Rupp, Christian Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstraße 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19946223.5 | 16.09.2019 | [2022/21] | WO2019CN105993 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021051240 | Date: | 25.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4000172 | Date: | 25.05.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.03.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 25.03.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H02M1/44, H02M3/335, // H02M1/32, H02M1/42, H02M1/00, H02M3/00 | [2022/32] | CPC: |
H02M1/44 (EP,US);
H02M3/33523 (EP,CN);
H05B45/3725 (US);
H02H9/04 (CN);
H02M1/0006 (EP);
H02M1/0012 (CN);
H02M1/32 (EP,CN,US);
H02M3/33569 (US);
H02M1/0058 (EP);
H02M1/007 (EP);
H02M1/4225 (EP);
H02M3/01 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2022/21] | H02M3/335 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/21] | Title | German: | LEISTUNGSWANDLER MIT KONDENSATOREN ZUR DATENÜBERTRAGUNG | [2022/21] | English: | POWER CONVERTER HAVING CAPACITORS FOR DATA TRANSMISSION | [2022/21] | French: | CONVERTISSEUR DE COURANT AYANT DES CONDENSATEURS POUR TRANSMETTRE DES DONNÉES | [2022/21] | Entry into regional phase | 16.02.2022 | National basic fee paid | 16.02.2022 | Search fee paid | 16.02.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.02.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.02.2022 | Examination requested [2022/21] | 28.11.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.11.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP1459430 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]); | [A]US2008031286 (ALFANO DONALD E [US], et al); | [XI]CN103427655 (GUANGZHOU MORNSUN SCI & TECH); | [XI]CN106411136 (UNIV ZHEJIANG, et al); | [XI]EP3278439 (ALPHA AND OMEGA SEMICONDUCTOR (CAYMAN) LTD [US]); | [A]CN207098936U (SHENZHEN LONG X C POWER SUPPLY CO LTD) |