EP4044641 - TERMINAL DEVICE AND COMMUNICATION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.04.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.07.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NTT DOCOMO, INC. 11-1 Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-Ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | [2022/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
UMEDA, Hiromasa c/o Intellectual Property Department, NTT DOCOMO INC., SANNO PARK TOWER, 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | [2022/33] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2022/33] | Application number, filing date | 19948585.5 | 11.10.2019 | [2022/33] | WO2019JP40297 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021070380 | Date: | 15.04.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4044641 | Date: | 17.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 15.04.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.05.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04W8/22, H04W52/18, H04W52/36 | [2023/25] | CPC: |
H04W8/22 (EP);
H04W52/18 (EP);
H04W52/367 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2022/33] | H04W8/22, H04W52/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/33] | Title | German: | ENDGERÄT UND KOMMUNIKATIONSVERFAHREN | [2022/33] | English: | TERMINAL DEVICE AND COMMUNICATION METHOD | [2022/33] | French: | DISPOSITIF TERMINAL ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMUNICATION | [2022/33] | Entry into regional phase | 05.04.2022 | Translation filed | 05.04.2022 | National basic fee paid | 05.04.2022 | Search fee paid | 13.04.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.04.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.04.2022 | Examination requested [2022/33] | 03.01.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/22] | 24.01.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2024/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2023 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - NTT DOCOMO ET AL, "PC2 output power and UL dutycycle", vol. RAN WG4, no. Chongqing, China; 20191014 - 20191018, (20191004), 3GPP DRAFT; R4-1910925, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG4_Radio/TSGR4_92Bis/Docs/R4-1910925.zip, (20191004), XP051793267 [X] 1-4 * the whole document * | International search | [Y] - NTT DOCOMO, INC., "PC2 Output power and UL duty cycle", 3GPP TSG RAN WG4 Meeting #92bis, R4-1910925, (20191004), XP051793267 [Y] 1-4 * , section 2.1 * | [Y] - HUAWEI, "HiSilicon, On power class fallback and Pcmax for HPUE", 3GPP TSG-RAN WG4 Meeting #92 R4- 1909103, (20190816), XP051772008 [Y] 1-4 * , sections 1, 2.3 * |