EP4051848 - TILE APPARATUS WITH SELECTIVELY COLLAPSIBLE NON-ADHESIVE SUPPORT SYSTEM AND METHOD OF USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.01.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.08.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.2024 | Withdrawal of application | published on 21.02.2024 [2024/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Immediatile, LLC 265 Seaboard Lane, Suite G-103 Franklin, TN 37067 / US | [2022/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FARRAGE, Jr., David, J. 2950 McKinney Avenue, 315 Dallas, TX 75204 / US | 02 /
BRODERICK, Kevin, T. 193 McLemore Road Taft, TN 38488 / US | [2022/36] | Representative(s) | Bandpay & Greuter 11 rue Christophe Colomb 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2022/36] | Bandpay & Greuter 30, rue Notre-Dame des Victoires 75002 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 19951088.4 | 28.10.2019 | [2022/36] | WO2019US58344 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021086309 | Date: | 06.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4051848 | Date: | 07.09.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.05.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 06.05.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.06.2023 | Classification | IPC: | E04F15/02, E04F13/08 | [2023/31] | CPC: |
E04F15/0215 (EP);
E04F15/02155 (US);
E04F13/0885 (EP);
E04F2290/00 (US)
|
Former IPC [2022/36] | E04F15/00, E04B5/02, B32B7/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/36] | Title | German: | FLIESENVORRICHTUNG MIT SELEKTIV ZUSAMMENKLAPPBAREM NICHTKLEBENDEM TRÄGERSYSTEM UND VERWENDUNGSVERFAHREN | [2022/36] | English: | TILE APPARATUS WITH SELECTIVELY COLLAPSIBLE NON-ADHESIVE SUPPORT SYSTEM AND METHOD OF USE | [2022/36] | French: | APPAREIL DU TYPE TUILE AVEC SYSTÈME DE SUPPORT NON ADHÉSIF PLIABLE DE FAÇON SÉLECTIVE ET PROCÉDÉ D'UTILISATION | [2022/36] | Entry into regional phase | 30.05.2022 | National basic fee paid | 30.05.2022 | Search fee paid | 30.05.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.05.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/36] | 15.11.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.01.2024 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2024/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2023 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE6608169U (BREVETEAM SA [CH]) [A] 1* figure 1 *; | [I]DE102005024437 (HUELSTA WERKE HUELS KG [DE]) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0023] , [0 31] , [0 59] , [0 60]; figure 7 * | International search | [A]US5344693 (SANDERS BERNARD [GB]) [A] 1-36,38 * , entire document *; | [XY]US5487929 (RUSINCOVITCH JR GEORGE [US], et al) [X] 1-6, 10-16, 19-26, 30, (31 -32, 34, 36, 38)/(1-6, 10-16, 19-26, 30) * , entire document, especially Fig. 1-6, col. 1 In. 41, col. 2 In. 9-10, col. 4 In. 1, 2, 36, 44, 47, col. 5 In. 36, col. 7 In. 42-48, col. 8 In. 53, col. 9 In. 1-3 * [Y] 7-9, 17-18, 27-29, (31-32, 34, 36, 38)/(7-9, 17-18, 27-29), 33/(31/(1-30)), 35/(34/(1-30)); | [A]US2005112314 (HAMILTON PETER W [US], et al) [A] 1-36, 38 * , entire document *; | [A]US2005276971 (KITCHIN JONATHAN P [US], et al) [A] 1-36, 38 * , entire document *; | [Y]WO2007144726 (VAN DER HOVEN CLIFTON AUBREY [ZA]) [Y] 27, (31-36, 38)/(27),(33,35)/(1-30) * , entire document, especially Fig. 1, abstract *; | [Y]US2010173120 (MCGILL SHAWN DAVID [US]) [Y] 28-29, (31-36, 38)/(28-29) * , entire document, especially Fig. 2, para [0019] *; | [A]US2011146200 (DANG TUAN N [US]) [A] 1-36, 38* , entire document *; | [Y]WO2012075427 (FARRAGE DAVID J [US], et al) [Y] 7-9, 17-18, (31-36, 38)/(7-9, 17-18) * , entire document, especially Fig 1, para [0031] *; | [A]US2017058536 (WALENS DAVID [US], et al) [A] 1-36, 38 * , entire document *; | [A] - Anonymous, "Polyvinylidene chloride", Wikipedia, the free encyclopedia, (20190809), Wikipedia, the free encyclopedia, URL: https://en.wikipedia.org/wiki/Polyvinylidene_chloride, (20220615), XP055931830 [A] 21 * , entire document. * | [A] - Anonymous, "PVC Foam", NetComposites, Chesterfield, UK, NetComposites, URL: https://web.archive.org/web/20200924074221/https://netcomposites.com/guide/core-materials/pvc-foam/, (20191219), XP009536938 [A] 21 * , entire document * |