EP4053269 - TRANSAMINASE MUTANT AND APPLICATION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.08.2022 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.10.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Asymchem Laboratories (Tianjin) Co., Ltd No. 6 Dongting 3rd Street, TEDA Tianjin 300457 / CN | [2022/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HONG, Hao 600 Airport Blvd Morrisville North Carolina 27560 / US | 02 /
JAMES, Gage 600 Airport Blvd, Suite 1000 Morrisville North Carolina 27560 / US | 03 /
XIAO, Yi No. 71, 7th St. TEDA Tianjin 300457 / CN | 04 /
MA, Yulei No. 71, 7th St. TEDA Tianjin 300457 / CN | 05 /
ZHANG, Na No. 71, 7th St. TEDA Tianjin 300457 / CN | 06 /
JIAO, Xuecheng No. 71, 7th St. TEDA Tianjin 300457 / CN | 07 /
MU, Huiyan No. 71, 7th St. TEDA Tianjin 300457 / CN | 08 /
CHENG, Yibing No. 71, 7th St. TEDA Tianjin 300457 / CN | 09 /
CAO, Shan No. 71, 7th St. TEDA Tianjin 300457 / CN | [2022/36] | Representative(s) | Delbarba, Andrea Bugnion S.p.A. Viale Lancetti, 17 20158 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2022/36] | Biggi, Cristina Bugnion S.p.A. Viale Lancetti 17 20158 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 19951177.5 | 28.10.2019 | [2022/36] | WO2019CN113743 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021081713 | Date: | 06.05.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4053269 | Date: | 07.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 06.05.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C12N9/10, C12N15/54, C12P13/00 | [2022/36] | CPC: |
C12N9/1096 (EP,US);
C12P13/001 (EP,US);
C12P41/006 (EP);
C12Y206/01 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/36] | Title | German: | TRANSAMINASE-MUTANT UND ANWENDUNG DAVON | [2022/36] | English: | TRANSAMINASE MUTANT AND APPLICATION THEREOF | [2022/36] | French: | MUTANT DE TRANSAMINASE ET APPLICATION ASSOCIÉE | [2022/36] | Entry into regional phase | 30.03.2022 | Translation filed | 30.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 30.03.2022 | Search fee paid | 30.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/36] | 31.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.03.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]CN108384767 (ASYMCHEM LIFE SCIENCE TIANJIN CO LTD) [X] 1-15 * example -; claim - *; | [X]WO2019095161 (ASYMCHEM LIFE SCIENCE TIANJIN CO LTD [CN]) [X] 1-15 * example -; claim - *; | [X]WO2019148494 (ASYMCHEM LIFE SCIENCE TIANJIN CO LTD [CN]) [X] 1-15 * example -; claim - *; | US2020239895 [ ] (HONG HAO [CN], et al); | EP3733689 [ ] (ASYMCHEM LIFE SCIENCE TIANJIN CO LTD [CN]) |