EP4059373 - SLIDE FASTENER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.12.2023 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.09.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.08.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states YKK CORPORATION 1, Kanda Izumi-cho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-8642 / JP | [2022/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKA, Yasuhito c/o YKK CORPORATION Kurobe,200,Yoshida Kurobe-shi, Toyama 938-8601 / JP | 02 /
KOBAYASHI, Rito c/o YKK CORPORATION,PMO Akihabarakita,1-31-7, Taito,Taito-ku Tokyo 110-0016 / JP | 03 /
SAITO, Leona c/o YKK CORPORATION Kurobe,200,Yoshida Kurobe-shi, Toyama 938-8601 / JP | [2022/38] | Representative(s) | Sevinç, Erkan Istanbul Patent A.S. Plaza-33, Büyükdere Cad. No: 33/16 Sisli 34381 Istanbul / TR | [2022/38] | Application number, filing date | 19952869.6 | 12.11.2019 | [2022/38] | WO2019JP44412 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021095139 | Date: | 20.05.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4059373 | Date: | 21.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4059373 | Date: | 10.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 20.05.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A44B19/38, A44B19/26 | [2022/46] | CPC: |
A44B19/262 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2022/38] | A44B19/38 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/38] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | REISSVERSCHLUSS | [2022/38] | English: | SLIDE FASTENER | [2022/38] | French: | FERMETURE À GLISSIÈRE | [2022/38] | Entry into regional phase | 29.03.2022 | Translation filed | 29.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 29.03.2022 | Search fee paid | 29.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/38] | 04.04.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.09.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.11.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 29.11.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.11.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 10.01.2024 | IS | 10.05.2024 | [2024/32] |
Former [2024/31] | NL | 10.01.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]JPS457845Y [A] 1-15; | [A]JPH04231003 (YOSHIDA KOGYO KK) [A] 1-15; | [A]WO2011004500 (YKK CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-15; | [A]WO2015063927 (YKK CORP [JP]) [A] 1-15; | [A]WO2019175944 (YKK CORP [JP]) [A] 1-15 | by applicant | JPH0415216B | WO2018061208 | WO2019175944 |