EP4059618 - THERMOSETTING RESIN COMPOSITION, CURED FILM, METHOD FOR FORMING MULTILAYER COATING FILM, ESTER COMPOUND, AND POLYMER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.08.2022 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kyoeisha Chemical Co., Ltd. 6-12, Minamihonmachi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0054 / JP | [2022/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MORIWAKI, Yuya c/o Nara Laboratory of KYOEISHA CHEMICAL CO.,LTD. 2-5, Saikujo-cho 5-chome Nara-shi, Nara 630-8453 / JP | 02 /
MATSUDA, Tomoya c/o Nara Laboratory of KYOEISHA CHEMICAL CO.,LTD. 2-5, Saikujo-cho 5-chome Nara-shi, Nara 630-8453 / JP | 03 /
ASADA, Kosuke c/o Nara Laboratory of KYOEISHA CHEMICAL CO.,LTD. 2-5, Saikujo-cho 5-chome Nara-shi, Nara 630-8453 / JP | 04 /
DONKAI, Masaru c/o Nara Laboratory of KYOEISHA CHEMICAL CO.,LTD. 2-5, Saikujo-cho 5-chome Nara-shi, Nara 630-8453 / JP | 05 /
NAKAGAWA, Hiroki c/o Nara Laboratory of KYOEISHA CHEMICAL CO.,LTD. 2-5, Saikujo-cho 5-chome Nara-shi, Nara 630-8453 / JP | 06 /
MAEO, Keiji c/o Nara Laboratory of KYOEISHA CHEMICAL CO.,LTD. 2-5, Saikujo-cho 5-chome Nara-shi, Nara 630-8453 / JP | 07 /
YOSHIDA, Narutoshi c/o Nara Laboratory of KYOEISHA CHEMICAL CO.,LTD. 2-5, Saikujo-cho 5-chome Nara-shi, Nara 630-8453 / JP | 08 /
TAKENAKA, Naomi c/o Nara Laboratory of KYOEISHA CHEMICAL CO.,LTD. 2-5, Saikujo-cho 5-chome Nara-shi, Nara 630-8453 / JP | [2022/38] | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | [2022/38] | Application number, filing date | 19952870.4 | 14.11.2019 | [2022/38] | WO2019JP44708 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021095202 | Date: | 20.05.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4059618 | Date: | 21.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 20.05.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.07.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B05D1/36, C08L33/14, C08F220/14, C08F220/28, C09D133/06 | [2023/35] | CPC: |
C08F220/14 (EP);
C08F220/283 (EP,US);
B05D7/542 (US);
C08F212/08 (US);
C08F220/06 (US);
C08F220/1808 (US);
C08F220/20 (US);
C08J5/18 (US);
C09D133/066 (EP);
C09D133/08 (US);
C09D133/10 (US);
B05D2202/10 (EP);
| C-Set: |
C09D133/066, C08K5/11 (EP);
B05D2451/00, B05D2401/20, B05D2401/10 (EP);
C08F220/14, C08F220/20, C08F212/08 (EP);
C08F220/283, C08F220/1808, C08F220/20, C08F212/08 (EP); |
Former IPC [2022/38] | B05D1/36, C08L33/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/38] | Title | German: | WÄRMEHÄRTBARE HARZZUSAMMENSETZUNG, GEHÄRTETER FILM, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES MEHRSCHICHTIGEN BESCHICHTUNGSFILMS, ESTERVERBINDUNG UND POLYMER | [2022/38] | English: | THERMOSETTING RESIN COMPOSITION, CURED FILM, METHOD FOR FORMING MULTILAYER COATING FILM, ESTER COMPOUND, AND POLYMER | [2022/38] | French: | COMPOSITION DE RÉSINE THERMODURCISSABLE, FILM DURCI, PROCÉDÉ DE FORMATION D'UN FILM DE REVÊTEMENT MULTICOUCHE, COMPOSÉ ESTER ET POLYMÈRE | [2022/38] | Entry into regional phase | 10.06.2022 | Translation filed | 10.06.2022 | National basic fee paid | 10.06.2022 | Search fee paid | 10.06.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.06.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/38] | 14.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.12.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]JP2001316637 (DAINIPPON INK & CHEMICALS); | [A]JP2003119401 (DAINIPPON INK & CHEMICALS); | [AD]US2019284385 (MORIWAKI YUYA [JP], et al) | International search | [XY]JP2001316637 (DAINIPPON INK & CHEMICALS); | [X]JP2002309113 (DAINIPPON INK & CHEMICALS); | [XY]JP2003119401 (DAINIPPON INK & CHEMICALS); | [X]JP2004217857 (DAINIPPON INK & CHEMICALS); | [A]JP2013083966 (FUJIFILM CORP); | [A]JP2014041327 (FUJIFILM CORP); | [A]JP2014153686 (TOKYO OHKA KOGYO CO LTD); | [A]WO2017094479 (JSR CORP [JP]); | [Y]WO2019203100 (KYOEISHA CHEMICAL CO LTD [JP]) | by applicant | JP6398026B | WO2019139069 |