EP4056762 - COMPOSITE EXPANDED-PLATE PILE CONSTRUCTION METHOD AND EQUIPMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.07.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.08.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zhu, Bo Rm 16E, Block 9B, Qiaoxiangcun No. 1 Antuoshanjiulu Futian District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518000 / CN | For all designated states Pei, Junyi Rm 1401, Block 9-1, Changshuiyuan Suijiangdao Hexi District Tianjin 300202 / CN | [2022/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHU, Bo Rm 16E, Block 9B, Qiaoxiangcun No. 1 Antuoshanjiulu Futian District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518000 / CN | 02 /
PEI, Xiaofeng 401, 6 Gate, Longjiang Li, Dongting Road Hexi District Tianjin, Hebei 300201 / CN | 03 /
PEI, Junyi Rm 1401, Block 9-1, Changshuiyuan Suijiangdao Hexi District Tianjin 300202 / CN | 04 /
ZHU, Luning 1801, 6 Buildings, Quanhai Garden Futian District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518000 / CN | [2022/37] | Representative(s) | von Tietzen und Hennig, Nikolaus Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstraße 23 80538 München / DE | [2022/37] | Application number, filing date | 19953713.5 | 18.12.2019 | [2022/37] | WO2019CN126283 | Priority number, date | CN201911204245 | 29.11.2019 Original published format: CN201911204245 | [2022/37] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021103209 | Date: | 03.06.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4056762 | Date: | 14.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 03.06.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | E02D5/36, E02D5/46, E02D5/48 | [2022/37] | CPC: |
E02D5/36 (EP,CN,US);
E02D5/46 (EP,CN,US);
E02D5/48 (EP,CN,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/37] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR KONSTRUKTION EINES VERBUNDPFAHLS MIT EXPANDIERTER PLATTE UND GERÄT | [2022/37] | English: | COMPOSITE EXPANDED-PLATE PILE CONSTRUCTION METHOD AND EQUIPMENT | [2022/37] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET ÉQUIPEMENT DE CONSTRUCTION DE PIEU À PLAQUE EXPANSÉE COMPOSITE | [2022/37] | Entry into regional phase | 09.06.2022 | Translation filed | 09.06.2022 | National basic fee paid | 09.06.2022 | Search fee paid | 09.06.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.06.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/37] | 09.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.02.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.07.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.10.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.12.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.04.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.06.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CN104074184 (KONG CHAO); | [A]CN104988907 (WANG JIZHONG); | [A]CN106087999 (WANG JIZHONG); | [A]CN108729440 (AVIC XURI BEIJING GEOTECHNICAL ENGINEERING TECH CO LTD, et al); | [XI]CN109778847 (PEI XIAOFENG, et al) |