EP4057504 - INDUCTORS, OSCILLATORS AND TERMINAL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.08.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2022/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHI, Yusong Huawei Administration Building, Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
ZHAO, Yunfeng Huawei Administration Building, Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
YOU, Huancheng Huawei Administration Building, Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2022/37] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2022/37] | Application number, filing date | 19953766.3 | 28.11.2019 | [2022/37] | WO2019CN121649 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021102812 | Date: | 03.06.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4057504 | Date: | 14.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 03.06.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H03B5/12, H01F21/12 | [2022/37] | CPC: |
H03B5/12 (EP);
H01F21/12 (EP,US);
H01F27/29 (US);
H01F27/40 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/37] | Title | German: | INDUKTOREN, OSZILLATOREN UND ENDGERÄT | [2022/37] | English: | INDUCTORS, OSCILLATORS AND TERMINAL DEVICE | [2022/37] | French: | INDUCTEURS, OSCILLATEURS ET DISPOSITIF TERMINAL | [2022/37] | Entry into regional phase | 08.06.2022 | Translation filed | 08.06.2022 | National basic fee paid | 08.06.2022 | Search fee paid | 08.06.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.06.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/37] | 17.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.05.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2005052272 (TIEBOUT MARC [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,5,7-9,11-15 * figures 1,5 *; | [A]US2005242915 (DOLMANS WILHELMUS M C [NL], et al) [A] 1-15 * figures 2b, 2c *; | [X]US2007158782 (HEIKKINEN JARI J [FI]) [X] 1,2,4,5,7-9,11-14 * paragraph [0039]; figures 3,4 *; | [A]US9425737 (BUSHMAN MICHAEL L [US], et al) [A] 1-15* figure 6 *; | [XI]CN105917464 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M) [X] 1-14 * figures 2, 3 * [I] 15 |