EP4072135 - ATTRIBUTE INFORMATION PREDICTION METHOD, ENCODER, DECODER AND STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.10.2023 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.09.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP., LTD. No. 18 Haibin Road Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | [2022/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WAN, Shuai No. 18, Haibin Road, Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | 02 /
WEI, Lei No. 18, Haibin Road, Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | 03 /
YANG, Fuzheng No. 18, Haibin Road, Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | 04 /
HUO, Junyan No. 18, Haibin Road, Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | 05 /
MA, Yanzhuo No. 18, Haibin Road, Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | 06 /
YANG, Lihui No. 18, Haibin Road, Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | [2022/41] | Representative(s) | Thorniley, Peter, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [2022/41] | Application number, filing date | 19954841.3 | 02.12.2019 | [2022/41] | WO2019CN122499 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021108969 | Date: | 10.06.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4072135 | Date: | 12.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 10.06.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.05.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04N19/124 | [2022/41] | CPC: |
H04N19/597 (EP,CN,KR);
H04N19/88 (EP,KR);
H04N19/124 (CN,KR);
G06T9/001 (EP,US);
G06T7/75 (US);
G06T9/004 (EP);
H04N19/13 (KR);
H04N19/463 (EP);
H04N19/50 (CN);
H04N19/593 (EP);
H04N19/91 (CN);
H04N19/96 (CN,KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/41] | Title | German: | ATTRIBUTINFORMATIONSVORHERSAGEVERFAHREN, CODIERER, DECODIERER UND SPEICHERMEDIUM | [2022/41] | English: | ATTRIBUTE INFORMATION PREDICTION METHOD, ENCODER, DECODER AND STORAGE MEDIUM | [2022/41] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉDICTION D'INFORMATIONS D'ATTRIBUT, ENCODEUR, DÉCODEUR ET SUPPORT DE STOCKAGE | [2022/41] | Entry into regional phase | 23.06.2022 | Translation filed | 23.06.2022 | National basic fee paid | 23.06.2022 | Search fee paid | 23.06.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.06.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/41] | 02.08.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.08.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.10.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.03.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.05.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I] - "G-PCC codec description", no. n18673, (20190906), 127. MPEG MEETING; 20190708 - 20190712; GOTHENBURG; (MOTION PICTURE EXPERT GROUP OR ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11),, URL: http://phenix.int-evry.fr/mpeg/doc_end_user/documents/127_Gothenburg/wg11/w18673.zip w18673.docx, (20190906), XP030206833 [I] 1-14 * paragraph [3.6;3.6.1] - paragraph [3.6.7]; figures 35,36 * | [I] - HYEJUNG HUR (LGE) ET AL, "[G-PCC][New proposal] On sampling-based LOD generation", no. m49424, (20190704), 127. MPEG MEETING; 20190708 - 20190712; GOTHENBURG; (MOTION PICTURE EXPERT GROUP OR ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11),, URL: http://phenix.int-evry.fr/mpeg/doc_end_user/documents/127_Gothenburg/wg11/m49424-v1-m49424.zip m49424_G-PCC_New_On sampling-based LOD generation.docx, (20190704), XP030207737 [I] 1-14 * page 1, paragraph 1 - page 3, paragraph 3.3; figures 1-14 * |