EP3816371 - AIR - SUPPORTED STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.10.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.11.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.08.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.11.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 03.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DUOL d.o.o. Kapalniska pot 2 1351 Brezovica pri Ljubljani / SI | [2021/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OLAJ, Dusan Ob Farjevcu 76 1000 Ljubljana / SI | [2021/18] | Representative(s) | Golmajer Zima, Marjanca Patentna pisarna d.o.o. Copova 14 1000 Ljubljana / SI | [2021/18] | Application number, filing date | 20000397.8 | 04.11.2020 | [2021/18] | Priority number, date | SI20190000209 | 04.11.2019 Original published format: SI 201900209 | [2021/18] | Filing language | SL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3816371 | Date: | 05.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3816371 | Date: | 14.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | E04H15/22 | [2021/18] | CPC: |
E04H15/22 (EP);
E04H2015/205 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/50] |
Former [2021/18] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | LUFTGESTÜTZTE STRUKTUR | [2021/18] | English: | AIR - SUPPORTED STRUCTURE | [2021/18] | French: | STRUCTURE GONFLABLE | [2021/18] | Examination procedure | 05.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.11.2021 | Examination requested [2021/50] | 05.11.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.03.2022 | Observations by third parties | 09.04.2022 | Observations by third parties | 06.06.2022 | Observations by third parties | 09.08.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.11.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 03.11.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.11.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 15.09.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 14.12.2022 | CZ | 14.12.2022 | DK | 14.12.2022 | EE | 14.12.2022 | ES | 14.12.2022 | IT | 14.12.2022 | LV | 14.12.2022 | MC | 14.12.2022 | RO | 14.12.2022 | RS | 14.12.2022 | SK | 14.12.2022 | SM | 14.12.2022 | GR | 15.03.2023 | IS | 14.04.2023 | PT | 14.04.2023 | [2024/32] |
Former [2024/26] | AL | 14.12.2022 | |
CZ | 14.12.2022 | ||
DK | 14.12.2022 | ||
EE | 14.12.2022 | ||
ES | 14.12.2022 | ||
IT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
RO | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
SK | 14.12.2022 | ||
SM | 14.12.2022 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
IS | 14.04.2023 | ||
PT | 14.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | AL | 14.12.2022 | |
CZ | 14.12.2022 | ||
DK | 14.12.2022 | ||
EE | 14.12.2022 | ||
ES | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
RO | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
SK | 14.12.2022 | ||
SM | 14.12.2022 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
IS | 14.04.2023 | ||
PT | 14.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/39] | AL | 14.12.2022 | |
CZ | 14.12.2022 | ||
EE | 14.12.2022 | ||
ES | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
RO | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
SK | 14.12.2022 | ||
SM | 14.12.2022 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
IS | 14.04.2023 | ||
PT | 14.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 14.12.2022 | |
CZ | 14.12.2022 | ||
EE | 14.12.2022 | ||
ES | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
RO | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
SK | 14.12.2022 | ||
SM | 14.12.2022 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
PT | 14.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 14.12.2022 | |
CZ | 14.12.2022 | ||
EE | 14.12.2022 | ||
ES | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
RO | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
SM | 14.12.2022 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
PT | 14.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | CZ | 14.12.2022 | |
EE | 14.12.2022 | ||
ES | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
RO | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
SM | 14.12.2022 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
PT | 14.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | EE | 14.12.2022 | |
ES | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
SM | 14.12.2022 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
PT | 14.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | ES | 14.12.2022 | |
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
SM | 14.12.2022 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/27] | LV | 14.12.2022 | |
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | LV | 14.12.2022 | |
GR | 15.03.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAYI]US2003019168 (MILLER CHRIS KINGLSEY [AU], et al) [X] 1 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0006]; figures 1, 3a * * paragraph [0026] * [A] 3 [Y] 2 [I] 4,5; | [YA]GB2519552 (HOT POD YOGA LTD [GB]) [Y] 2 * page 2, paragraph last *[A] 3; | [XAYI]KR101931524B (WORLD ORGANIZATION AIRDOME CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1 * figures 2-5 * [A] 3 [Y] 2 [I] 4,5; | [XAYI]US2019112830 (FRAIOLI DENISE [US], et al) [X] 1 * paragraph [0058] - paragraph [0060]; figures 3,8,15 * * paragraph [0086] * * paragraph [0111] * [A] 3 [Y] 2 [I] 4,5 | Examination | US2649101 | US4567696 | EP0345600 |