EP3822634 - BIOSENSOR STRIP AND METHOD THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.03.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.11.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 16.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.11.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Apex Biotechnology Corporation No. 7 Li-Hsin 5th Road Hsinchu Science-Based Industrial Park Hsinchu City 300 / TW | [2021/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shing, Chung-Yen No. 26-60, Leli 3rd St., Anle Dist. 204 Keelung City / TW | 02 /
LIN, Bo-Chun No. 134, Aijie Rd., Su-Ao Township 270 Yilan County / TW | 03 /
Chen, Sz-Hau 4F., No. 27, Aly. 2, Ln. 19, Chang-An W. Rd. Zhongshan Dist. 104 Taipei City / TW | 04 /
Chen, Hong-Wen No. 10, Ln. 241, Wuquan S. Rd., South Dist. 402 Taichung City / TW | 05 /
Liang, Heng-Chia No. 29, Ln. 49, Minxi Rd., Minxiong Township 621 Chiayi County / TW | [2021/20] | Representative(s) | Flaccus, Rolf-Dieter Flaccus · Müller-Wolff Patentanwälte Bussardweg 10 50389 Wesseling / DE | [2021/20] | Application number, filing date | 20000408.3 | 11.11.2020 | [2021/20] | Priority number, date | US201962935473P | 14.11.2019 Original published format: US 201962935473 P | [2021/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3822634 | Date: | 19.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/483, B01L3/00, G01N27/327 | [2021/20] | CPC: |
G01N33/483 (EP);
B01L3/502715 (US);
B01L3/502723 (EP);
B01L3/502746 (EP);
G01N27/3272 (EP,US);
B01L2200/16 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0645 (EP,US);
B01L2300/069 (US);
B01L2300/0816 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0883 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0887 (EP,US);
B01L2400/0688 (EP,US);
B01L2400/0694 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/50] |
Former [2021/20] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BIOSENSORSTREIFEN UND VERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2021/20] | English: | BIOSENSOR STRIP AND METHOD THEREOF | [2021/20] | French: | BANDE DE BIOCAPTEUR ET PROCÉDÉ ASSOCIÉ | [2021/20] | Examination procedure | 10.11.2021 | Examination requested [2021/50] | 10.11.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.04.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.07.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2004206408 (PETERS RALF-PETER [DE], et al) [Y] 5* paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0012] *; | [XI]US2006078986 (LY PETER [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * figures 3,5 * [I] 4; | [XI]WO2009024916 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [X] 1,2 * page 2, line 31 - page 3, line 10; figure 2 * [I] 4; | [Y]WO2011071772 (MESO SCALE TECHNOLOGIES LLC [US], et al) [Y] 3 * page 97, columns 22-24 *; | [XYI]US8252248 (KRAEMER PETER [DE]) [X] 1,2 * column 9, line 1 - column 12, line 38; figures 1-2 * [Y] 3,5 [I] 4,6-8; | [XI]US2018164243 (NOUMI SHUNSUKE [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,9,10 * paragraphs [0096] - [0107]; figures 4-5 * [I] 4,6 |