EP3832830 - OPTIMIZED ENERGY ACCUMULATION SYSTEM AND RELATED METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.11.2021 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 07.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Università degli Studi di Roma "La Sapienza" Piazzale Aldo Moro, 5 00185 Roma / IT | [2021/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VALLATI, Andrea Via Sabrata 13 00199 ROMA / IT | [2021/23] | Representative(s) | Garavelli, Paolo A.BRE.MAR. S.R.L. Consulenza in Proprietà Industriale Via Servais 27 10146 Torino / IT | [2021/23] | Application number, filing date | 20000430.7 | 26.11.2020 | [2021/23] | Priority number, date | IT20190023262 | 06.12.2019 Original published format: IT201900023262 | [2021/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3832830 | Date: | 09.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H02J3/28, H02J15/00, F15B1/04 | [2021/23] | CPC: |
H02J3/28 (EP);
F15B1/02 (EP);
F28D20/0034 (EP);
F28D7/024 (EP);
H02J15/006 (EP);
F15B2201/205 (EP);
F15B2201/42 (EP);
F28D2020/0078 (EP);
Y02E60/14 (EP);
Y02P90/50 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/52] |
Former [2021/23] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | OPTIMIERTES ENERGIESPEICHERSYSTEM UND ENTSPRECHENDES VERFAHREN | [2021/23] | English: | OPTIMIZED ENERGY ACCUMULATION SYSTEM AND RELATED METHOD | [2021/23] | French: | SYSTÈME D'ACCUMULATION D'ÉNERGIE OPTIMISÉ ET PROCÉDÉ ASSOCIÉ | [2021/23] | Examination procedure | 24.11.2021 | Examination requested [2021/52] | 24.11.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE102011018679 (STEEL DENNIS PATRICK [DE]) [X] 1-3* paragraphs [0027] - [0037]; figures 1-5 * |