EP3678448 - NETWORK ASSISTED CONNECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.12.2021 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.01.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 05.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.07.2024 | New entry: Date of oral proceedings | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Comcast Cable Communications LLC 1701 John F. Kennedy Blvd. Philadelphia, Pennsylvania 19103 / US | [2020/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bharatia, Jayshree c/o Comcast Cable Communications, LLC 1701 JFK Boulevard Philadelphia, PA 19103 / US | 02 /
Dinan, Esmael c/o Comcast Cable Communications, LLC 1701 JFK Boulevard Philadelphia, PA 19103 / US | 03 /
Park, Kyungmin c/o Comcast Cable Communications, LLC 1701 JFK Boulevard Philadelphia, PA 19103 / US | 04 /
Talebi Fard, Peyman c/o Comcast Cable Communications, LLC 1701 JFK Boulevard Philadelphia, PA 19103 / US | 05 /
Qiao, Weihua c/o Comcast Cable Communications, LLC 1701 JFK Boulevard Philadelphia, PA 19103 / US | 06 /
Ryu, Jinsook c/o Comcast Cable Communications, LLC 1701 JFK Boulevard Philadelphia, PA 19103 / US | [2020/28] | Representative(s) | V.O. P.O. Box 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [2020/28] | Application number, filing date | 20150227.5 | 03.01.2020 | [2020/28] | Priority number, date | US201962787843P | 03.01.2019 Original published format: US 201962787843 P | [2020/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3678448 | Date: | 08.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.05.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04W76/15, H04W76/16, H04W76/22, // H04W24/10 | [2020/28] | CPC: |
H04W76/16 (EP);
H04W76/20 (US);
H04W60/00 (US);
H04W76/15 (EP,US);
H04W76/22 (EP);
H04W8/02 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/07] |
Former [2020/28] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NETZWERKGESTÜTZTE VERBINDUNG | [2020/28] | English: | NETWORK ASSISTED CONNECTION | [2020/28] | French: | CONNEXION ASSISTÉE PAR RÉSEAU | [2020/28] | Examination procedure | 11.01.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/07] | 11.01.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.02.2022 | Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01) | 17.03.2022 | Reply to an invitation to indicate the basis for amendments | 18.08.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.12.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.11.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.01.2025 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |