EP3683418 - ENGINE COOLING STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.07.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.07.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.03.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.01.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 19.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mazda Motor Corporation 3-1, Shinchi, Fuchu-cho Aki-gun Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP | [2020/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WATANABE, Shinji c/o MAZDA MOTOR CORPORATION 3-1, Shinchi Fuchu-cho, Aki-gun, Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP | 02 /
TAKAHATA, Tatsuya c/o MAZDA MOTOR CORPORATION 3-1, Shinchi Fuchu-cho, Aki-gun, Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP | 03 /
HAYAMIZU, Yoshiaki 509-7, Shigekane Takaya-cho, Higashihiroshima-shi, Hiroshima 739-2122 / JP | 04 /
WATANABE, Keita c/o MAZDA MOTOR CORPORATION 3-1, Shinchi Fuchu-cho, Aki-gun, Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP | 05 /
KAWAGUCHI, Mikimasa Joy Palace C201, 15-12, Saijohigashikita-machi Higashihiroshima-shi, Hiroshima 739-0048 / JP | [2020/30] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2020/30] | Application number, filing date | 20150495.8 | 07.01.2020 | [2020/30] | Priority number, date | JP20190006066 | 17.01.2019 Original published format: JP 2019006066 | [2020/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3683418 | Date: | 22.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3683418 | Date: | 25.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.05.2020 | Classification | IPC: | F01P3/02, F02F1/14 | [2020/30] | CPC: |
F01P3/02 (EP,US);
F02F1/14 (EP,US);
F01P11/08 (US);
F01P3/14 (US);
F01P5/10 (US);
F01P2003/001 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/09] |
Former [2020/30] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | MOTORKÜHLSTRUKTUR | [2020/30] | English: | ENGINE COOLING STRUCTURE | [2020/30] | French: | STRUCTURE DE REFROIDISSEMENT DE MOTEUR | [2020/30] | Examination procedure | 21.01.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/09] | 21.01.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.03.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.07.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 15.07.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 15.07.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.05.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/31] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.01.2020 | AL | 25.08.2021 | AT | 25.08.2021 | CY | 25.08.2021 | CZ | 25.08.2021 | DK | 25.08.2021 | EE | 25.08.2021 | ES | 25.08.2021 | FI | 25.08.2021 | HR | 25.08.2021 | IT | 25.08.2021 | LT | 25.08.2021 | LV | 25.08.2021 | MC | 25.08.2021 | MK | 25.08.2021 | MT | 25.08.2021 | NL | 25.08.2021 | PL | 25.08.2021 | RO | 25.08.2021 | RS | 25.08.2021 | SE | 25.08.2021 | SI | 25.08.2021 | SK | 25.08.2021 | SM | 25.08.2021 | BG | 25.11.2021 | NO | 25.11.2021 | GR | 26.11.2021 | IS | 25.12.2021 | PT | 27.12.2021 | IE | 07.01.2022 | LU | 07.01.2022 | BE | 31.01.2022 | FR | 31.01.2022 | [2024/44] |
Former [2024/25] | HU | 07.01.2020 | |
AL | 25.08.2021 | ||
AT | 25.08.2021 | ||
CY | 25.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 25.08.2021 | ||
DK | 25.08.2021 | ||
EE | 25.08.2021 | ||
ES | 25.08.2021 | ||
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
HR | 25.08.2021 | ||
IT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
MC | 25.08.2021 | ||
MK | 25.08.2021 | ||
NL | 25.08.2021 | ||
PL | 25.08.2021 | ||
RO | 25.08.2021 | ||
RS | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
SI | 25.08.2021 | ||
SK | 25.08.2021 | ||
SM | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
NO | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
PT | 27.12.2021 | ||
IE | 07.01.2022 | ||
LU | 07.01.2022 | ||
BE | 31.01.2022 | ||
FR | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AL | 25.08.2021 | |
AT | 25.08.2021 | ||
CY | 25.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 25.08.2021 | ||
DK | 25.08.2021 | ||
EE | 25.08.2021 | ||
ES | 25.08.2021 | ||
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
HR | 25.08.2021 | ||
IT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
MC | 25.08.2021 | ||
MK | 25.08.2021 | ||
NL | 25.08.2021 | ||
PL | 25.08.2021 | ||
RO | 25.08.2021 | ||
RS | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
SI | 25.08.2021 | ||
SK | 25.08.2021 | ||
SM | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
NO | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
PT | 27.12.2021 | ||
IE | 07.01.2022 | ||
LU | 07.01.2022 | ||
BE | 31.01.2022 | ||
FR | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AL | 25.08.2021 | |
AT | 25.08.2021 | ||
CY | 25.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 25.08.2021 | ||
DK | 25.08.2021 | ||
EE | 25.08.2021 | ||
ES | 25.08.2021 | ||
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
HR | 25.08.2021 | ||
IT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
MC | 25.08.2021 | ||
NL | 25.08.2021 | ||
PL | 25.08.2021 | ||
RO | 25.08.2021 | ||
RS | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
SI | 25.08.2021 | ||
SK | 25.08.2021 | ||
SM | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
NO | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
PT | 27.12.2021 | ||
IE | 07.01.2022 | ||
LU | 07.01.2022 | ||
BE | 31.01.2022 | ||
FR | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AL | 25.08.2021 | |
AT | 25.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 25.08.2021 | ||
DK | 25.08.2021 | ||
EE | 25.08.2021 | ||
ES | 25.08.2021 | ||
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
HR | 25.08.2021 | ||
IT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
MC | 25.08.2021 | ||
NL | 25.08.2021 | ||
PL | 25.08.2021 | ||
RO | 25.08.2021 | ||
RS | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
SI | 25.08.2021 | ||
SK | 25.08.2021 | ||
SM | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
NO | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
PT | 27.12.2021 | ||
IE | 07.01.2022 | ||
LU | 07.01.2022 | ||
BE | 31.01.2022 | ||
FR | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 25.08.2021 | |
AT | 25.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 25.08.2021 | ||
DK | 25.08.2021 | ||
EE | 25.08.2021 | ||
ES | 25.08.2021 | ||
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
HR | 25.08.2021 | ||
IT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
MC | 25.08.2021 | ||
NL | 25.08.2021 | ||
PL | 25.08.2021 | ||
RO | 25.08.2021 | ||
RS | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
SI | 25.08.2021 | ||
SK | 25.08.2021 | ||
SM | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
NO | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
PT | 27.12.2021 | ||
LU | 07.01.2022 | ||
BE | 31.01.2022 | ||
FR | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | AL | 25.08.2021 | |
AT | 25.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 25.08.2021 | ||
DK | 25.08.2021 | ||
EE | 25.08.2021 | ||
ES | 25.08.2021 | ||
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
HR | 25.08.2021 | ||
IT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
MC | 25.08.2021 | ||
NL | 25.08.2021 | ||
PL | 25.08.2021 | ||
RO | 25.08.2021 | ||
RS | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
SI | 25.08.2021 | ||
SK | 25.08.2021 | ||
SM | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
NO | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
PT | 27.12.2021 | ||
LU | 07.01.2022 | ||
FR | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/46] | AL | 25.08.2021 | |
AT | 25.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 25.08.2021 | ||
DK | 25.08.2021 | ||
EE | 25.08.2021 | ||
ES | 25.08.2021 | ||
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
HR | 25.08.2021 | ||
IT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
MC | 25.08.2021 | ||
NL | 25.08.2021 | ||
PL | 25.08.2021 | ||
RO | 25.08.2021 | ||
RS | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
SI | 25.08.2021 | ||
SK | 25.08.2021 | ||
SM | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
NO | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
PT | 27.12.2021 | ||
LU | 07.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/39] | AL | 25.08.2021 | |
AT | 25.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 25.08.2021 | ||
DK | 25.08.2021 | ||
EE | 25.08.2021 | ||
ES | 25.08.2021 | ||
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
HR | 25.08.2021 | ||
IT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
MC | 25.08.2021 | ||
NL | 25.08.2021 | ||
PL | 25.08.2021 | ||
RO | 25.08.2021 | ||
RS | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
SI | 25.08.2021 | ||
SK | 25.08.2021 | ||
SM | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
NO | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
PT | 27.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 25.08.2021 | |
AT | 25.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 25.08.2021 | ||
DK | 25.08.2021 | ||
EE | 25.08.2021 | ||
ES | 25.08.2021 | ||
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
HR | 25.08.2021 | ||
IT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
NL | 25.08.2021 | ||
PL | 25.08.2021 | ||
RO | 25.08.2021 | ||
RS | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
SI | 25.08.2021 | ||
SK | 25.08.2021 | ||
SM | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
NO | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
PT | 27.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 25.08.2021 | |
AT | 25.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 25.08.2021 | ||
DK | 25.08.2021 | ||
EE | 25.08.2021 | ||
ES | 25.08.2021 | ||
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
HR | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
NL | 25.08.2021 | ||
PL | 25.08.2021 | ||
RO | 25.08.2021 | ||
RS | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
SK | 25.08.2021 | ||
SM | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
NO | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
PT | 27.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AT | 25.08.2021 | |
CZ | 25.08.2021 | ||
DK | 25.08.2021 | ||
EE | 25.08.2021 | ||
ES | 25.08.2021 | ||
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
HR | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
NL | 25.08.2021 | ||
PL | 25.08.2021 | ||
RO | 25.08.2021 | ||
RS | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
SK | 25.08.2021 | ||
SM | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
NO | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
PT | 27.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 25.08.2021 | |
CZ | 25.08.2021 | ||
DK | 25.08.2021 | ||
EE | 25.08.2021 | ||
ES | 25.08.2021 | ||
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
HR | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
NL | 25.08.2021 | ||
PL | 25.08.2021 | ||
RO | 25.08.2021 | ||
RS | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
SK | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
NO | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
PT | 27.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 25.08.2021 | |
DK | 25.08.2021 | ||
ES | 25.08.2021 | ||
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
HR | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
NL | 25.08.2021 | ||
PL | 25.08.2021 | ||
RS | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
NO | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
PT | 27.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/16] | AT | 25.08.2021 | |
ES | 25.08.2021 | ||
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
HR | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
NL | 25.08.2021 | ||
PL | 25.08.2021 | ||
RS | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
NO | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
PT | 27.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 25.08.2021 | |
ES | 25.08.2021 | ||
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
HR | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
PL | 25.08.2021 | ||
RS | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
NO | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
PT | 27.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 25.08.2021 | |
ES | 25.08.2021 | ||
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
RS | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
NO | 25.11.2021 | ||
PT | 27.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 25.08.2021 | |
ES | 25.08.2021 | ||
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
NO | 25.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 25.08.2021 | |
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
NO | 25.11.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS556433U (?) [A] 1-7* figures 3,5 *; | [A]JPH07127520 (SUZUKI MOTOR CO) [A] 1-7 * figure 2 *; | [IA]JP2015108346 (MAZDA MOTOR) [I] 1,2 * paragraphs [0025] - [0091] * * figures 1-7 * [A] 3-7; | [A]DE102015006786 (MAZDA MOTOR [JP]) [A] 1-7 * figures 2,6 *; | [A]JP2018123742 (DAIHATSU MOTOR CO LTD) [A] 1-7 * figure 2 * | by applicant | JP2015190403 | JP2019006066 |