EP3683111 - BRAKE DEVICE FOR A WORKING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.05.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 19.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.06.2021 [2021/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Liebherr-Hydraulikbagger GmbH Liebherr-Strasse 12 88457 Kirchdorf / DE | [2020/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Meitinger, Bernhard Krautgässle 9A 87740 Buxheim / DE | 02 /
Schropp, Markus Weiherweg 23 87634 Obergünzburg / DE | 03 /
Mückl, Markus Brunnenstr. 20 87466 Oy-Mittelberg / DE | 04 /
Purr, Alexander Luitpoldstr. 9 89264 Weissenhorn / DE | [2020/30] | Representative(s) | Laufhütte, Dieter Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstraße 23 80538 München / DE | [2020/30] | Application number, filing date | 20150546.8 | 07.01.2020 | [2020/30] | Priority number, date | DE201910100935 | 15.01.2019 Original published format: DE102019100935 | [2020/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3683111 | Date: | 22.07.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.03.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B60T13/66 | [2020/30] | CPC: |
B60T13/66 (EP,CN);
B60T13/686 (US);
B60T13/586 (US);
B60T13/662 (EP);
B60T7/042 (US);
B60T8/17 (US);
B60T8/1701 (US);
B60T8/18 (US);
B60T8/246 (US);
B60T8/326 (US);
B60T2220/04 (US);
B60T2250/04 (US);
B60T2270/82 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/30] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BREMSVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINE ARBEITSMASCHINE | [2020/30] | English: | BRAKE DEVICE FOR A WORKING MACHINE | [2020/30] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE FREIN POUR UNE MACHINE DE TRAVAIL | [2020/30] | Examination procedure | 23.01.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/26] | 12.02.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2021/26] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2009138169 (UEMATSU KOJI [JP]) [X] 1-4,6-9 * paragraphs [0022] - [0043] - [0063] - [0098]; figures 1,2,3 * [Y] 5; | [Y]DE19501286 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [Y] 5 * column 2, line 15 - column 5, line 60; figures 1-4 *; | [A]DE19642344 (VOITH TURBO KG [DE]) [A] 1-10 * pages 5,6; figure 1 *; | [A]WO2018172256 (WABCO GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-10 * pages 23-31; figure 1 * |